Editing Alexander Cerny
Warning: You are not logged in. Your IP address will be publicly visible if you make any edits. If you log in or create an account, your edits will be attributed to your username, along with other benefits.
The edit can be undone.
Please check the comparison below to verify that this is what you want to do, and then save the changes below to finish undoing the edit.
Latest revision | Your text | ||
Line 1: | Line 1: | ||
− | Alexander Cerny (born on 21th May 1953) is | + | Alexander Cerny (born on 21th May 1953) is Czech politician. He has been member of the Chamber of Deputies Parliament of Czech Republic since 26. 10. 2013. He was elected on the slate of KSČM party. |
== Education == | == Education == | ||
− | He graduated from the Technical School of Electrical Engineering and then completed a year course in aviation officer training. In 1979 | + | He graduated from the Technical School of Electrical Engineering and then completed a year course in aviation officer training. In 1979 graduated from College of policy in Bratislava. He obtained his PhD degree in 1982, also in Bratislava. He was a professional soldier, and until 1990 he used to hold various positions at the Czechoslovak People's Army |
== Political career == | == Political career == | ||
− | Alexander Cerny has been | + | Alexander Cerny has been Committee on Defence member since 4. 12. 2013 and Committee on Defence vice-chairman since 5. 12. 2013. |
− | Mr. Cerny has also | + | Mr. Cerny has been also a member of Podvybor pro obrannou a bezpecnostni politiku a strategicke koncepce CR (czech name) since 30. 4. 2014. |
− | He has been | + | He has been member of Political group Communist Party of Bohemia and Moravia since 27. 10. 2013. |
== External links == | == External links == | ||
− | |||
[http://tema.novinky.cz/alexander-cerny Novinky portal] | [http://tema.novinky.cz/alexander-cerny Novinky portal] | ||
[http://www.psp.cz/en/sqw/detail.sqw?id=5307 Chamber of Deputies official] | [http://www.psp.cz/en/sqw/detail.sqw?id=5307 Chamber of Deputies official] | ||
− | |||
− |