User contributions
This user is currently blocked. The latest block log entry is provided below for reference:
- 10:31, 21 October 2014 Anjuoh (talk | contribs) blocked Robertson (talk | contribs) with an expiration time of indefinite (account creation disabled, autoblock disabled, email disabled)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 14:30, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Brixi Otto.jpg (current)
- 14:30, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-19) . . Jesús Caldera Sánchez-Capitán
- 14:30, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . MarÃa Pilar AlegrÃa Continente
- 14:29, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+746) . . N Otto Brixi (Created page with "Otto Brixi is the youngest Member of Parliament of SMER-SD. He was born 24. 9. 1985. He stood a seat for the region Košice. == Political career == He is the member of Klub S...")
- 14:29, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2,186) . . N Jesús Caldera Sánchez-Capitán (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|Jesús Caldera, spanish politician and forme Labor Minister Born in Béjar (Salamanca) in 1957, Jesús Caldera is a spanish d...")
- 14:28, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Celia Alberto Pérez
- 14:28, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+571) . . N Pavol Zajac (Created page with "Pavol Zajac was born on 7th of February 1967 in Vranov nad Topľou. He is currently a member of Slovak National Council as member of KDH and also of Committee on Finance and B...")
- 14:28, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-4) . . Celia Alberto Pérez
- 14:27, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,487) . . N Augustin Karel Andrle Sylor (Created page with "Augustin Karel Andrle Sylor (born on 25th October 1946) is czech politician and pedagogue. He has been member of the Chamber of Deputies Parliament of Czech Republic since 26....")
- 14:27, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-21) . . Juan Manuel Albendea Pabón
- 14:26, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+12) . . Diether Dehm
- 14:25, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,126) . . N Maurice Cummins (Created page with " Maurice Cummins is born 25 February 1953 in County Waterford. He is an Irish Fine Gael politician and member of Seanad Éireann. == Political Career == Maurice Cummins is a...")
- 14:25, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-13) . . Rosa Aguilar
- 14:24, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-105) . . Rene Beaumont
- 14:24, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Diether Dehm
- 14:24, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . Joseba Andoni Agirretxea Urresti
- 14:24, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Diether Dehm
- 14:23, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+15) . . Michel Becot
- 14:23, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+87) . . Panagiotis Mitarachi
- 14:23, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+75) . . Diether Dehm
- 14:23, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+736) . . N Karina Adsbøl (Created page with " Karina Adsbøl (born on 28th of November 1976), is a member of Parliament for the Danish People’s Party. == Political career == Member of Parliament for the Danish People'...")
- 14:23, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Drdehm 0ssenbrink200802.jpg (current)
- 14:22, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+87) . . File:Îότης ΜηταÏάκης 02.jpg (current)
- 14:22, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+381) . . N Pilar Cortés Bureta (Created page with " BORN on 1 December 1964 at Fountains Jiloca (Zaragoza) == Political Career == Member of the X legislature. == Education == Doctor of Law. Professor of Constitutional Law. ...")
- 14:22, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+7) . . José Luis Ãbalos Meco
- 14:22, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+28) . . Christophe Bechu
- 14:22, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Îότης ΜηταÏάκης 02.jpg
- 14:21, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+783) . . N Diether Dehm (Created page with "Diether Dehm is an Author, Ceo and member of the German Left Party. == Political Career == Dehm became a member of the SPD in 1966 and withdrew from the SPD in 1998. He was...")
- 14:21, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-32) . . Juan Antonio Abad Pérez
- 14:21, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-193) . . Ian Borg
- 14:21, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,861) . . N Panagiotis Mitarachi (Created page with "Panagioti Mitarachi was born in Athens in 1972.He is a Greek economist and politician ,elected as a Member of Parliament for A’ Athens, with New Democracy, for the first tim...")
- 14:18, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+47) . . Jozef BobÃk
- 14:18, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,617) . . N Mary White (Created page with "She was born in Dundalk in 1944. She is married to Mr. Padraic White and they have one daughter, Clionadh. She is the Seanad Spokesperson on Jobs, Enterprise and Innovation in...")
- 14:17, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+835) . . N Averil Power (Created page with " 2 00px|thumbnail|left Averil Power was born in July 1978, in Dublin (Ireland) and the senator for Dublin North East. == Political Career == In 2009, unfort...")
- 14:17, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Jozef BobÃk.jpg (current)
- 14:17, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Maria-Rizzotti.jpg (current)
- 14:17, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-76) . . Baylet, Jean-Michel
- 14:17, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+791) . . N Jozef BobÃk (Created page with "Jozef Bobík former Mayor of Michalovce. He stood for a seat for KDHin Michalovce. He was born 25.01.1952 in Veľaty. == Political career == He is the member of Klub KDH, Ma...")
- 14:16, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:AP.jpg (current)
- 14:15, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . Carmelo Abela
- 14:15, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+903) . . N Rudmer Heerema (Created page with "Rudmer Heerema (born on February 2nd, 1978 in Groningen) is a member of the Dutch House of Representatives for the People's Party for Freedom and Democracy (VVD). == Politica...")
- 14:15, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Rene Beaumont
- 14:15, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-76) . . Carmelo Abela
- 14:15, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+549) . . N Luigi Perrone (Created page with "Luigi Perrone (born in Corato, Puglia, on May 1st 1946) is an Italian politician. He is a member of the Forza Italia political party. == Political Career == He was appointed...")
- 14:14, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . Michel Becot
- 14:14, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Jesús Caldera.jpg (current)
- 14:14, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . Michèle André
- 14:13, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+46) . . N File:Jan.jpg (Jan Cichoń during the meeting with cizitizen.) (current)
- 14:13, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Pierre André
- 14:13, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Serge Andreoni
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)