User contributions
This user is currently blocked. The latest block log entry is provided below for reference:
- 10:31, 21 October 2014 Anjuoh (talk | contribs) blocked Robertson (talk | contribs) with an expiration time of indefinite (account creation disabled, autoblock disabled, email disabled)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 15:16, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Mihail Raykov Mikov
- 15:16, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-17) . . Cemile Giousouf
- 15:16, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,729) . . N José Manuel Soria López (Created page with " José Manuel Soria López (born 1958) is a Spanish politician, who has been serving as the Minister of Industry, Energy and Tourism since 2011. == Political career == Soria...")
- 15:16, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+970) . . N Cemile Giousouf (Created page with "Cemile Giousouf Cemile Giousouf mainly works as an aide to the North-Rhine Westphalian state parliament, and was born on May 5, 1978, in Leverkusen, North-Rhine Westphalia, G...")
- 15:14, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+74) . . Aichan Kara Giousouf
- 15:13, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,021) . . N Marie Benešová (Created page with "Marie Benesova (born on 17th April 1948) is Czech lawyer and politician. She has been member of the Chamber of Deputies Parliament of Czech Republic since 26. 10. 2013. He was...")
- 15:13, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:KaraGiousouf Aichan.png (current)
- 15:13, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+39) . . Miguel Ãngel Cortés (current)
- 15:13, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+756) . . N Lourdes Ciuro i Buldo (Created page with "Lourdes Ciuró i Buldó is a Spanish politician, member of the Convergence and Union coalition (CiU). She was born in Reus on June 3rd, 1971. == Political Career == Lourdes...")
- 15:12, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+818) . . N Aichan Kara Giousouf (Created page with "Aichan Kara Giousouf was born in Amaranta village in 1963.He is a Greek politician and dentist. == Political Career == He is member of Syriza since 1994.At the same time he ...")
- 15:05, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+12) . . Miguel Ãngel Cortizo Nieto (current)
- 15:04, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Ana Sofia Bettencourt (current)
- 15:03, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+79) . . Ana Sofia Bettencourt
- 15:03, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+48) . . Martin Chren
- 15:03, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-52) . . Joan Coscubiela Conesa (current)
- 15:02, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Ana Sofia Bettencourt.jpg (current)
- 15:02, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+668) . . N Ana Sofia Bettencourt (Created page with "Ana Sofia Fernandes Bettencourt was born on March 24th, 1972. She currently practices as an administrator from a public municipal company. == Political Career == Besides bein...")
- 15:01, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Martin Chren.jpeg (current)
- 15:01, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+714) . . N AdăscăliÅ£ei Constantin (Created page with "== Small introduction == Constantin Adascalitei (born 18 September 1967) it´s a Romanian politician and a karate master. He´s married and has 2 children. == Politic...")
- 15:01, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+51) . . MarÃa Angelina Costa Palacio (current)
- 15:00, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+524) . . N Martin Chren (Created page with "Martin Chren is a member of the National Council of Slovak Republic and an economist. He stood for a seat of SAS. He was born on the 17th of March in 1981. == Political caree...")
- 14:59, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-174) . . m Evarist Bartolo
- 14:58, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+894) . . N Jesse Klaver (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left|Jesse Klaver (GL) Member of the Dutch House of Representatives Jesse Klaver (born on May 1st, 1986 in Roosendaal) is a member o...")
- 14:57, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-37) . . Mallia, Emanuel
- 14:55, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+365) . . N Peter Å uca (Created page with "Peter Šuca was born on 8th of September 1968. He is currently a member of Slovak National Council as member of Smer-SD. He is also a vice-chairman of Committee on Defence and...")
- 14:55, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Paul-Olivier Delannois
- 14:54, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-27) . . Sabino Cuadra Lasarte (current)
- 14:53, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+644) . . Elias, Ton
- 14:53, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Sybille de Coster-Bauchau
- 14:52, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+45) . . Igor Choma
- 14:52, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Igor Choma.jpg (current)
- 14:52, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:MarÃa Ascensión.jpg (current)
- 14:52, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2,841) . . N Aliosman Ibrahim Imamov (Created page with "Aliosman Ibrahim Imamov is the Vice President of the National Assembly and was member of the Movoment for Rights and Freedom Political Party in Bulgaria. He was born on 20 Ma...")
- 14:52, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,075) . . N Igor Choma (Created page with "Igor Choma born on the 28th of January 28,1964 in Martin is a member of the National Council of the Slovak Republic for the party Smer-SD and Mayor of Zilina. == Political c...")
- 14:51, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-9) . . Joram van Klaveren
- 14:51, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Herrera, José (current)
- 14:51, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-246) . . Herrera, José
- 14:50, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Maurizio Buccarella.jpg (current)
- 14:50, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Jesse Klaver.jpg (current)
- 14:49, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+71) . . Ana Paula Vitorino
- 14:49, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Ana Paula Vitorino.jpg (current)
- 14:48, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+995) . . N Ana Paula Vitorino (Created page with "Ana Paula Mendes Vitorino was born on April 25th, 1962. She currently practices as a civil engineer and as a university professor. == Political Career == Ana Paula Vitorino i...")
- 14:48, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,467) . . N OndÅ™ej BeneÅ¡Ãk (Created page with "Ondřej Benešík (born on 27th June 1976) is Czech politician. He has been member of the Chamber of Deputies Parliament of Czech Republic since 26. 10. 2013. He was elected o...")
- 14:47, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+662) . . N Ivan Å vejna (Created page with "Ivan Švejna was born on 20th of November 1965. He is currently a member of Slovak National Council as member of Most-Híd and also of Committee on European Affairs and Specia...")
- 14:46, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,388) . . N Franco Cardiello (Created page with " == Introduction== Franco Cardiello was born on January 1st, 1957 in Eboli (Salerno). He has residency in Eboli. == Political Career == In the XII Legislature Cardiello was ...")
- 14:46, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,256) . . N MarÃa Luisa Carcedo Roces (Created page with "María Luisa Carcedo Roces, born in San Martín del Rey (Asturias) the 30th August of 1953 is a spanish politician of the Socialist Worker's Party. She is a national deputy an...")
- 14:45, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-161) . . Grech, Louis
- 14:43, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,809) . . N Barry Gardiner (Created page with " Barry Strachan Gardiner is born the 10th of March 1957 in Glasgow, Scotland. He is a British Labour Party politician who has been the Member of Parliament for Brent North si...")
- 14:42, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+23) . . Teresa Cunillera i Mestres (current)
- 14:40, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+330) . . Elias, Ton
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)