User contributions
This user is currently blocked. The latest block log entry is provided below for reference:
- 10:31, 21 October 2014 Anjuoh (talk | contribs) blocked Robertson (talk | contribs) with an expiration time of indefinite (account creation disabled, autoblock disabled, email disabled)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 15:02, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Joseph Muscat (Robertson moved page Muscat, Joseph to Joseph Muscat)
- 15:02, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+27) . . N Muscat, Joseph (Robertson moved page Muscat, Joseph to Joseph Muscat) (current)
- 15:01, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+48) . . Joseph Muscat
- 15:00, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+22) . . Silvio Parnis
- 14:57, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Silvio Parnis (Robertson moved page Parnis, Silvio to Silvio Parnis)
- 14:57, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+27) . . N Parnis, Silvio (Robertson moved page Parnis, Silvio to Silvio Parnis) (current)
- 14:52, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Keith Vaz (Robertson moved page Vaz, Keith to Keith Vaz)
- 14:52, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+23) . . N Vaz, Keith (Robertson moved page Vaz, Keith to Keith Vaz) (current)
- 14:52, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+28) . . Franco Carraro
- 14:52, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Shailesh Vara (Robertson moved page Vara, Shailesh to Shailesh Vara)
- 14:52, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+27) . . N Vara, Shailesh (Robertson moved page Vara, Shailesh to Shailesh Vara) (current)
- 14:51, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-8) . . Vaizey Edward
- 14:50, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Paul Uppal (Robertson moved page Uppal, Paul to Paul Uppal)
- 14:50, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+24) . . N Uppal, Paul (Robertson moved page Uppal, Paul to Paul Uppal) (current)
- 14:50, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-64) . . Chuka Umunna
- 14:49, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Sam Gyimah
- 14:48, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,191) . . N Franco Carraro (Created page with " Franco Carraro has served the Italian Parliament as Senator representing the region Emilia Romagna since 2013. Franco Carraro, born in Padua, Veneto, on December 6th 1939, is...")
- 14:47, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+90) . . Michael Gove
- 14:46, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Michael Gove
- 14:45, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+47) . . Michael Gove
- 14:41, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Pat Glass
- 14:40, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+12) . . Bibiano Serrano Calurano
- 14:38, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-3) . . Rafael Simancas Simancas
- 14:33, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+68) . . António Cardoso
- 14:32, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:António Cardoso.jpg (current)
- 14:32, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,009) . . N António Cardoso (Created page with "António Alves Cardoso was born on October 27th, 1953. He currently practices as a mechanical engineering. == Political Career == Besides being the deputy-mayor of Santa Mari...")
- 14:31, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Emanuela Munerato.jpg
- 14:30, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+12) . . Rafael Simancas Simancas
- 14:30, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Julie Fernandez-Fernandez
- 14:30, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+3) . . Anastasios Nerantzis
- 14:29, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,021) . . N MarÃa Arenales Serrano Argüello (Created page with "María Arenales Serrano Argüello (born 12 April 1963) is a Spanish Politician. == Political career == María Arenales Serrano has been a MP for the Spanish People's Party ...")
- 14:27, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+858) . . N Benny Engelbrecht (Created page with "Benny Engelbrecht (born August 4, 1970 in Amager) is a Danish politician who since November 13, 2007 has been an MP for the Social Democrats. == Political Career == Engelbre...")
- 14:27, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+762) . . N Piotr Bauć (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left Piotr Bauć (born 29 July 1960) is a Polish politician. == Political career == Bauć was elected to the Sejm in the 2011 Pol...")
- 14:27, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,366) . . N Carlo Azeglio Ciampi (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left == Introduction == Carlo Azeglio Ciampi is a life tenure member of the Italian Senate. == Political Career == Born in...")
- 14:27, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+841) . . N File talk:Giovanna Mangili.jpg (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|Giovanna Mangili == Biography == Giovanna Mangili was born in Monza on August 1st, 1967. She is an employee and she live...")
- 14:26, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-57) . . Rosa MarÃa DÃez González
- 14:26, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Carlo azeglio ciampi.jpg (current)
- 14:25, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+43) . . Josep Antoni Duran i Lleida
- 14:23, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+601) . . N Astrid Krag (Created page with "Astrid Krag Kristensen (born November 17, 1982 in Vejle) is a Danish politician who since November 13, 2007 has been an MP for the Socialist People's Party. == Political Car...")
- 14:23, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+391) . . N Angel Petrov Naydenov (Created page with "Angel Petrov Naydenov is a Bulgarian politician and MP of the 42the National Assembly of the Republic of Bulgaria. He was born on 28 September 1958. He is a member of the poli...")
- 14:22, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+952) . . N Jan Birke (Created page with "Jan Birke (born on 12th May 1960) is Czech politician. He has been member of the Chamber of Deputies Parliament of Czech Republic since 26. 10. 2013. He was elected on the sla...")
- 14:22, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,681) . . N Janusz DziÄ™cioÅ‚ (Created page with "thumbnail|left|Janusz Dzięcioł.PO.Member of Parliament Janusz Andrzej Dzięcioł was born 11 December 1953. He is a Polish politician, known a...")
- 14:22, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+802) . . N Keith Vaz (Vaz Keith UK MP)
- 14:21, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-14) . . Anastasios Nerantzis
- 14:21, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Anastasios Nerantzis
- 14:19, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,283) . . N Anastasios Nerantzis (Created page with "Anastasios Nerantzis (Greek: Αναστάσιος Νεραντζής) (born October 3, 1944) is a Greek politician and lawyer. He currently serves as a New Democracy Party mem...")
- 14:16, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-106) . . Silvio Parnis
- 14:16, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+306) . . Robert Arrigo
- 14:16, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+496) . . N Anni Matthiesen (Created page with "Anni Matthiesen (February 8, 1964 in Faaborg) is an MP for the Liberal Party, elected in September 2011. == Political Career == Member of Parliament for the Liberal Party in ...")
- 14:16, 1 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:VAZ.jpeg (current)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)