User contributions
This user is currently blocked. The latest block log entry is provided below for reference:
- 10:31, 21 October 2014 Anjuoh (talk | contribs) blocked Robertson (talk | contribs) with an expiration time of indefinite (account creation disabled, autoblock disabled, email disabled)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 09:01, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-33) . . Stephen Gilbert
- 09:01, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+835) . . N Carlo Martelli (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|Carlo Martelli == Biography == He was born on May 23rd 1966 in Novara, in Piemonte. He is an University teacher of mathemat...")
- 09:01, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:António Filipe.jpg (current)
- 09:01, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,375) . . N António Filipe (Created page with "António Filipe Gaião Rodrigues was born on January 28th, 1963. He currently practices as a lawyer and University Professor. == Political Career == Besides being a Professor...")
- 09:01, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Bohuslav Svoboda
- 09:00, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Sauli Ahvenjärvi (Robertson moved page Ahvenjärvi, Sauli to Sauli Ahvenjärvi)
- 09:00, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+31) . . N Ahvenjärvi, Sauli (Robertson moved page Ahvenjärvi, Sauli to Sauli Ahvenjärvi) (current)
- 09:00, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+617) . . N Barry Madlener (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left Barry Madlener was born on the 6th of January 1969 in Leiden. He is a politician for the Dutch House of Representatives for the Part...")
- 09:00, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+889) . . N Stanislav Pfleger (Created page with "Stanislav Pfleger (born on 14th May 1958) is Czech businessman and politician. He has been member of the Chamber of Deputies Parliament of Czech Republic since 26. 10. 2013. H...")
- 09:00, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . Nick Gibb
- 08:58, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-64) . . Nick Gibb
- 08:58, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,261) . . N Anton Konstantinov Kutev (Created page with "Anton Konstantinov Kutev is a Bulgarian politician at the 42th National Assembly of the Republic of Bulgaria. He was born on 13 September 1968 in Sofia. == Political Career ==...")
- 08:57, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-74) . . Jason Azzopardi
- 08:56, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-86) . . Andrew George
- 08:55, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Elena Udrea
- 08:54, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Jason Azzopardi (Robertson moved page Azzopardi, Jason to Jason Azzopardi)
- 08:54, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+29) . . N Azzopardi, Jason (Robertson moved page Azzopardi, Jason to Jason Azzopardi) (current)
- 08:54, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+21) . . David Gauke
- 08:53, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . Adăscăliţei Constantin
- 08:52, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+760) . . N Jonny Crosio (Created page with "Jonny Crosio (born in Zurich, Switzerland, on July 20th 1962) is an Italian politician and architect. He is a member of the Lega Nord political party. == Political Career == ...")
- 08:50, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-8) . . Adam Luminiţa-Pachel
- 08:50, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Madlener.JPG
- 08:50, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,388) . . N Nia Griffith (Created page with " Nia Rhiannon Griffith (born 4 December 1956) is a British Labour Party politician, who has been the Member of Parliament (MP) for Llanelli since 2005. Griffith currently ser...")
- 08:49, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+61) . . Adam Hofman
- 08:49, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-37) . . Anton Abele
- 08:49, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Zoran Aleksandrov Rangelov
- 08:48, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+22) . . Mark Garnier
- 08:47, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+783) . . N LuÃsa Salgueiro (Created page with "Luísa Maria Neves Salgueiro was born on January 2nd, 1968. She currently practices as a Legal Consultant and Portuguese Politician. == Political Career == She has been elect...")
- 08:47, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+681) . . N André Frederic (Created page with "André Frederic, born July 4, 1958, is a Belgian Member of Parliament, Chairman of the PS group and Alderman of the city of Theux (Belgium). == Political Career == André ...")
- 08:47, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Carlo Azeglio Ciampi
- 08:46, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-73) . . Edward Garnier
- 08:45, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,242) . . N Roberto Battelli (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left|Roberto Battelli Roberto Battelli (born October 19, 1954) is a member of Slovenian National Assembly and a member Italian a...")
- 08:44, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+16) . . Luis Alberto Orellana
- 08:44, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+575) . . N Emmanuel Burton (Created page with " Emmanuel Burton (14 January 1973) is a Belgian politician and member of the Francophone liberal party MR (Movement Réformateur). == Political career == Burton is mayor of ...")
- 08:44, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Andres Anvelt EST.jpeg (current)
- 08:43, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . File:Roberto Battelli.jpg (Robertson uploaded a new version of "File:Roberto Battelli.jpg") (current)
- 08:42, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-4) . . Gian Marco Centinaio
- 08:41, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . Eva Durán Ramos
- 08:40, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-32) . . Adam Afriyie
- 08:40, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Ander Sepp EST.png (current)
- 08:39, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Giovanna Mangili
- 08:39, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Aivara Sõerd EST.jpeg (current)
- 08:38, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,270) . . N Bohuslav Svoboda (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left Bohuslav Svoboda was born on February 8, 1944 in Prague. He is a Czech doctor in gynecology and obstetrics field and a polit...")
- 08:38, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+857) . . N Gian Marco Centinaio (Created page with "Gian Marco Centinaio (born in Pavia on October 31st 1971) is an Italian politician. He is a member of the Lega Nord political party. == Political Career == In 2005 he was el...")
- 08:37, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-204) . . Frederick Azzopardi
- 08:37, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Carlo Martelli.jpg (current)
- 08:37, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+884) . . N Eva Durán Ramos (Created page with "She was born in Talavera de la Reina (Toledo) in 1954. == Political Career == She has chaired the Technical Working Group of the Women's Hall of Madrid in the 1995-1999 perio...")
- 08:36, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Stefano Lucidi
- 08:35, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Elisa Bulgarelli
- 08:34, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+13) . . Nunziante Consiglio
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)