User contributions
This user is currently blocked. The latest block log entry is provided below for reference:
- 10:31, 21 October 2014 Anjuoh (talk | contribs) blocked Robertson (talk | contribs) with an expiration time of indefinite (account creation disabled, autoblock disabled, email disabled)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 09:27, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-71) . . Sam Gyimah
- 09:26, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+676) . . N Adam KÄ™piÅ„ski (Created page with " Adam Kępiński was born in Ozimek(small city 22km from Opole in Małopolska District) and his a Polish politician. == Political career == Adam Kępinski is a left-social...")
- 09:26, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Arto Aas EST.png (current)
- 09:25, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . Andrew Gwynne
- 09:25, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Simon Busuttil (Robertson moved page Busuttil, Simon to Simon Busuttil)
- 09:25, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+28) . . N Busuttil, Simon (Robertson moved page Busuttil, Simon to Simon Busuttil) (current)
- 09:23, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-33) . . Antoine Borg
- 09:23, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Annely Akkermann.png (current)
- 09:23, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+787) . . N Marcos Perestrello (Created page with "Marcos da Cunha e Lorena Perestrello de Vasconcellos was born on August 23th, 1971. He currently practices as business manager and lawyer as well as a portuguese politician. ...")
- 09:22, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Francesco Molinari.jpg (current)
- 09:22, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-26) . . Ben Gummer
- 09:22, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Antoine Borg (Robertson moved page Borg, Antoine to Antoine Borg)
- 09:22, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+26) . . N Borg, Antoine (Robertson moved page Borg, Antoine to Antoine Borg) (current)
- 09:21, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,541) . . N Yannick Botrel (Created page with "Yannick Botrel, born 9 December 1951, has been a socialist senateur within the French Senate since 2008, representing the Côtes-d'Armor department. He was reelected in Septem...")
- 09:21, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+519) . . N Franky Demon (Created page with " Franky Demon (Bruges, 28 June 1976) is a Belgian politician and member of the Christian People's party CD&V. == Political career == Franky Demon started his political care...")
- 09:20, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+68) . . António Gameiro
- 09:20, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-115) . . Anthony Bezzina
- 09:20, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:António Gameiro.jpg (current)
- 09:19, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,029) . . N António Gameiro (Created page with "António Ribeiro Gameiro was born on August 14th, 1970. He currently practices as a lawyer and university professor. == Political Career == Besides being a lawyer and univers...")
- 09:19, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-20) . . Andrew Griffiths
- 09:18, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+608) . . N Bruno Marton (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|Bruno Marton == Biography == Bruno Marton was born September 28th 1969 in Varedo, a small town near Monza, Lombardia. He is ...")
- 09:17, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+938) . . N Alena Nohavová (Created page with "Alena Nohavová was born on April 7, 1960, in České Budějovice. She is a Czech politician and teacher, from October 2013 Member of the Chamber of Deputies. In 2008 she beca...")
- 09:17, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-43) . . Nia Griffith
- 09:15, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Andres Jalak EST.png (current)
- 09:15, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Outi Alanko-Kahiluoto (Robertson moved page Alanko-Kahiluoto, Outi to Outi Alanko-Kahiluoto)
- 09:15, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+35) . . N Alanko-Kahiluoto, Outi (Robertson moved page Alanko-Kahiluoto, Outi to Outi Alanko-Kahiluoto) (current)
- 09:14, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-82) . . Michael Gove
- 09:14, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-543) . . Sauli Ahvenjärvi
- 09:13, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+560) . . N Antoniy Yordanov Yordanov (Created page with "Antony Yordanov Yordanov is a PM in The 42th National Assembly of the Republic of Bulgaria. He was born on 3 Macrh 1966 in Plovdiv. He speaks English and Russian. == Political...")
- 09:11, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Anthony Bezzina (Robertson moved page Bezzina, Anthony to Anthony Bezzina)
- 09:11, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+29) . . N Bezzina, Anthony (Robertson moved page Bezzina, Anthony to Anthony Bezzina) (current)
- 09:11, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-95) . . Pat Glass
- 09:10, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+852) . . N Manuel Isaac (Created page with "Manuel Fialho Isaac was born on January 26th, 1960. He currently practices as an agricultural entrepreneur and as a Portuguese Politician. == Political Career == He serves as...")
- 09:10, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-21) . . Sheila Gilmore
- 09:09, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+517) . . N Willy Demeyer (Created page with " Willy Demeyer (Jupille, 17 maart 1959) is a Francophone-Belgian politician and member of the Francophone socialiste party PS (Parti Socialiste). == Political career == Will...")
- 09:09, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Gerkens Muriel.jpg (current)
- 09:09, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+522) . . N SreÄko BlažiÄ (Created page with "Srečko Blažič (born June 27, 1953) is a member of Slovenian National Assembly and a member of the SMC (The Party of Miro Cerar). == Political career == In July 2014, he...")
- 09:09, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Antonio gentile.jpg (current)
- 09:08, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-10) . . Cheryl Gillan
- 09:07, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:IRL Andres Herkel.jpg (current)
- 09:07, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,135) . . N Andrew Griffiths (Created page with " Andrew James Griffiths (born 19 October 1970) is an English politician. He is the Conservative Member of Parliament for Burton. Griffiths was elected in the 2010 General El...")
- 09:06, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+15) . . Benoît Friart
- 09:05, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+612) . . N Silvana Andreina Comaroli (Created page with "Silvana Andreina Comaroli (born in Soncino on March 27th 1967) is an Italian politician. She is a member of the Lega Nord political party. == Political Career == She was a m...")
- 09:05, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,030) . . N Benoît Friart (Created page with "Benoît Friart, born in Haine-Saint-Paul on June 3, 1951, is a Belgian entrepreneur and MR politician. Friart was born into a family of brewers (St-Feuillien, Le Rœulx). ==...")
- 09:05, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+3,035) . . N Andreas Loverdos (Created page with " Andreas Loverdos (Greek: Ανδρέας Λοβέρδος, born on 15 May 1956, in Patras, Greece) is a Greek politician, lawyer and University Professor. He is the Minister o...")
- 09:05, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Bruno Marton.jpg (current)
- 09:05, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-3) . . Roberto Battelli
- 09:04, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-28) . . Michelle Gildernew
- 09:03, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+36) . . Adam Rybakowicz
- 09:02, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+66) . . António Filipe
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)