User contributions
This user is currently blocked. The latest block log entry is provided below for reference:
- 10:31, 21 October 2014 Anjuoh (talk | contribs) blocked Robertson (talk | contribs) with an expiration time of indefinite (account creation disabled, autoblock disabled, email disabled)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 10:01, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,660) . . N Gabriel Elorriaga Pisarik (Created page with "He was born in Madrid in 1962. == Political Career == After the electoral victory of the Popular Party, he was appointed in May 1996 the Office of the Deputy Prime Minister ...")
- 10:01, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+749) . . N Aare Heinvee (Created page with "Aare Heinvee, born 27th of September 1956 in Rapla, has been an MP for the Estonian Reform party from 1999 to the present day. == Political Career == Heinvee has been an MP ...")
- 10:00, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Peter Gauweiler.jpg (current)
- 10:00, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+815) . . N Margarida Almeida (Created page with "Margarida Rosa Silva de Almeida was born on January 17th, 1955. She currently practices as a professor and lawyer as well as a Portuguese politician. == Political Career == S...")
- 09:59, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+20) . . Eva Durán Ramos (current)
- 09:57, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,087) . . N Miroslav Opalka (Created page with "Miroslav Opalka (born on 9th October 1952) is Czech politician. He has been member of the Chamber of Deputies Parliament of Czech Republic since 26. 10. 2013. He was elected o...")
- 09:56, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+869) . . N Igor Jakubcik (Created page with "Igor Jakubcik was born on May 12, 1967, in Klatovy. He is a Czech politician, from January 2013 to August 2013 Member of the Chamber of Deputies, since 2012 the Pilsen Region ...")
- 09:56, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+695) . . N Georges Gilkinet (Created page with "Georges Gilkinet, born in Namur (Belgium) on January 25, 1971, is a Belgian ECOLO politician. == Political Career == Gilkinet has been a Member of Parliament since 2007. ...")
- 09:55, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Ester Tuiksoo EST.png (current)
- 09:55, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+487) . . N Tilen BožiÄ (Created page with "Tilen Božič (born September 18, 1982) is a member of Slovenian National Assembly and a member of the SMC (The Party of Miro Cerar; Slovene: Stranka Mira Cerarja). == Caree...")
- 09:54, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Maij.jpg (current)
- 09:53, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+59) . . António Prôa
- 09:52, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:António Prôa.jpg (current)
- 09:51, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+586) . . N António Prôa (Created page with "António Manuel Pimenta Prôa was born on October 26th, 1969. == Political Career == This is António Prôa’s first mandate as a deputy at the National Parliament for the C...")
- 09:51, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Michela Montevecchi.jpg (current)
- 09:51, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,748) . . N Andreas Lykourentzos (Created page with " Andreas Lykourentzos (Greek: Ανδρέας Λυκουρέντζος, born on 4 January 1957, in Tripoli, Greece) is a Greek politician and political scientist. He is a Membe...") (current)
- 09:50, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Erki Nool EST.png (current)
- 09:49, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Keith Vaz
- 09:48, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2,037) . . N Dominic Grieve (Created page with " Dominic Charles Roberts Grieve (born 24 May 1956) is a British Conservative politician, barrister, Queen's Counsel and a Member of the Privy Council. He has been the Member o...")
- 09:46, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Barry Madlener
- 09:46, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . File:Madlener.JPG (Robertson uploaded a new version of "File:Madlener.JPG") (current)
- 09:45, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Shailesh Vara
- 09:45, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,659) . . N Muriel Gerkens (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left|Gerkens Muriel Muriel Gerkens, born in Hotton (Belgium) on April 25, 1957, is a Federal MP for ECOLO. She is one of the found...")
- 09:43, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-137) . . Vaizey Edward
- 09:43, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+792) . . N Francesco Molinari (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|Francesco Molinari == Biography == Francesco Molinari was born on October 2nd 1964 in Santeramo in Colle, a town near ...")
- 09:42, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . SreÄko BlažiÄ
- 09:40, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . Michael Donth
- 09:40, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+31) . . SreÄko BlažiÄ
- 09:39, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+614) . . N Atanas Stoyanov Padev (Created page with "Atanas Stoyanov Padev is a Bulgarian politician and PM of the 42nd National Assemly of the Republic of Bulgaria. He was born on 9 March 1975 in Stara Zagora. == Political Care...")
- 09:39, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-93) . . Paul Uppal
- 09:39, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Enn Eesmaa EST.png (current)
- 09:38, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Gabriel Sigmar
- 09:38, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Gabriel Sigmar
- 09:38, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Antonio Gentile
- 09:38, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+823) . . N Antonio Gentile (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left|Antonio Gentile, Italian Senator Antonio Gentile (born in Cosenza on april 8th 1950) is an Italian politician. He is a membe...")
- 09:38, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Gabriel Sigmar
- 09:37, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+761) . . N Mirjam Bon KlanjÅ¡Äek (Created page with "Mirjam Bon Klanjšček (born July 18, 1954) is a member of Slovenian National Assembly and a member of The Alliance of Alenka Bratušek (Slovene: Zavezništvo Alenke Bratušek...")
- 09:36, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Sigmar Gabriel.jpg (current)
- 09:35, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+103) . . Gabriel Sigmar
- 09:34, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+8) . . Michael Donth
- 09:34, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+882) . . N Michael Donth (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left|Michael Donth Michael Donth is a politician and a member of the Christian Democratic Union. == Political Career == Michael Donth has b...")
- 09:33, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:M.d.jpeg (current)
- 09:33, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Ene Ergma EST.png (current)
- 09:32, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-32) . . Chuka Umunna
- 09:30, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Mikko Alatalo (Robertson moved page Alatalo, Mikko to Mikko Alatalo)
- 09:30, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+27) . . N Alatalo, Mikko (Robertson moved page Alatalo, Mikko to Mikko Alatalo) (current)
- 09:30, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-230) . . Andreas Loverdos
- 09:29, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,213) . . N Gabriel Sigmar (Created page with "Sigmar Gabriel (born 12 September 1959) is a German politician who has served as Minister for Economic Affairs and Energy and Vice Chancellor of Germany since 2013. Since 2009...")
- 09:29, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-716) . . Outi Alanko-Kahiluoto
- 09:29, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Eiki Nestor EST.png (current)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)