User contributions
This user is currently blocked. The latest block log entry is provided below for reference:
- 10:31, 21 October 2014 Anjuoh (talk | contribs) blocked Robertson (talk | contribs) with an expiration time of indefinite (account creation disabled, autoblock disabled, email disabled)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 13:23, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-131) . . Onintza Enbeita Maguregi (current)
- 13:23, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2,061) . . N John Glen (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|John Glen John Philip Glen is a British Conservative Party politician, elected as Member of Parliament (MP) for Salisbury in the M...")
- 13:22, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Alen Prelec (Robertson moved page Alen prelec to Alen Prelec)
- 13:22, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+25) . . N Alen prelec (Robertson moved page Alen prelec to Alen Prelec) (current)
- 13:21, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+71) . . Milan Brglez
- 13:21, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Sevim DaÄŸdelen
- 13:21, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . André Pardal
- 13:21, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+32) . . Adam kwiatkowski
- 13:20, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+9) . . Milan Brglez
- 13:20, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+9) . . Franc Breznik
- 13:19, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+471) . . N Vladislav Petráš (Created page with "Vladislav Petrᚠwas born on 9th of September 1963. He is currently a member of Slovak National Council as a member of Smer-SD. He is a member of Committee on Finance and Bu...")
- 13:18, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-8) . . Adam Kępiński
- 13:18, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . Patrik Kuncar
- 13:18, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+9) . . Alenka Bratušek
- 13:18, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Merkies.jpg (current)
- 13:18, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Tilen BožiÄ
- 13:17, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:JAGNA MARCZULAJTIS.jpg (current)
- 13:17, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-8) . . António Braga
- 13:16, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Benoit Hellings (Robertson moved page Hellings Benoit to Benoit Hellings) (current)
- 13:16, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+29) . . N Hellings Benoit (Robertson moved page Hellings Benoit to Benoit Hellings) (current)
- 13:16, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+762) . . N Benoit Hellings (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left|Benoit Hellings Benoit Hellings, born in Oupeye on July 7, 1978, is a Belgian Walloon politician Ecolo. He is a former proje...")
- 13:16, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-28) . . Richard Graham
- 13:16, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+9) . . Ângela Guerra
- 13:16, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Mirjam Bon KlanjÅ¡Äek
- 13:15, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+71) . . SreÄko BlažiÄ
- 13:15, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-33) . . Antoine Borg
- 13:15, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,038) . . N Onintza Enbeita Maguregi (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left|Member of the Spanish Parliament (AMAIUR) She was born in (Muxika (Biscay), May 19, 1979) == Political Career == Onintza Enbeita belo...")
- 13:14, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Sergio Puglia.jpg (current)
- 13:14, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Andreia Neto
- 13:14, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Kattrin Jadin (Robertson moved page Jadin Kattrin to Kattrin Jadin over redirect)
- 13:14, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+27) . . N Jadin Kattrin (Robertson moved page Jadin Kattrin to Kattrin Jadin over redirect) (current)
- 13:14, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+104) . . Urška Ban
- 13:14, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+938) . . N Michel Boutant (Created page with " Michel Boutant (born November 23, 1956) is a member of the Senate of France, representing the Charente department. Boutant is a member of the Socialist Party of France. Outsi...")
- 13:14, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Kattrin Jadin (Robertson moved page Kattrin Jadin to Jadin Kattrin)
- 13:13, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,010) . . N Patrik Kuncar (Created page with "Patrik Kuncar was born on February 27, 1973 in Uherske Hradiste. He is a Czech politician and surveyor, from January 2014 senator for district Zlin. between November 2010 and ...")
- 13:12, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+361) . . N FrantiÅ¡ek Petro (Created page with "František Petro was born on 23rd of May 1961. He is currently a member of Slovak National Council as a member of Smer-SD. He is also a member of Committee on Economic Affairs...")
- 13:12, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+43) . . Anja Bah Žibert
- 13:12, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+3) . . André Pardal
- 13:11, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+24) . . N Angel, Marc (Robertson moved page Angel, Marc to Marc Angel) (current)
- 13:11, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Marc Angel (Robertson moved page Angel, Marc to Marc Angel)
- 13:11, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+56) . . Bravo Nico
- 13:10, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+585) . . N Alen Prelec (Created page with "Alen Prelec was born on July 27, 1967 in Zdenci Brdovečki, near Zaprešić. He is a member of the Croatian Parliament (Hrvatski Sabor) and a member of the Social Democratic P...")
- 13:10, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Bravo Nico.jpg (current)
- 13:10, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,196) . . N Richard Graham (Created page with "Richard Graham (born 4 April 1958) is a British Conservative Party politician, who joined the House of Commons in 2010 as the Conservative MP (Member of Parliament) for Glouce...")
- 13:10, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+93) . . Nada Brinovšek
- 13:10, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+986) . . N Bravo Nico (Created page with "José Carlos Bravo Nico was born on September 11th, 1964. He currently practices as an university professor. == Political Career == Besides being a member of the National Cou...")
- 13:09, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Agnieszka Pomaska.jpg (current)
- 13:08, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+3,015) . . N Corinne Bouchoux (Created page with "Corinne Bouchoux, born 5 January 1964, is a historian and a french poltician who became senator for the ''European Écologie-Les Verts'' (EELV) Green Party of Maine-et-Loire i...")
- 13:08, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+200) . . Andreas Xanthos
- 13:07, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+812) . . N Edita Pfundtner (Created page with "Edita Pfundtner was born on 30th of January 1973. He is currently a member of Slovak National Council as a member of Most-Híd. She is a member of Constitutional and Legal Aff...")
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)