User contributions
This user is currently blocked. The latest block log entry is provided below for reference:
- 10:31, 21 October 2014 Anjuoh (talk | contribs) blocked Robertson (talk | contribs) with an expiration time of indefinite (account creation disabled, autoblock disabled, email disabled)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 14:56, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Simone Beissel
- 14:55, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-224) . . Simone Beissel
- 14:55, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Bruno Dias.jpg (current)
- 14:55, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,006) . . N Giacomo Stucchi (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left == Introduction == Giacomo Stucchi was born 20th February 1969 in Bergamo, Italy; he works as consultant and journalist. He ...")
- 14:55, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+822) . . N Bruno Dias (Created page with "Bruno Ramos Dias was born on October 19th, 1976. He currently practices as senior technician of local government. == Political Career == Besides being a member of the Municip...")
- 14:55, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+389) . . N Milan PanáÄek (Created page with "Milan Panáček was born on 23rd of July 1977. He is currently a member of the Slovak National Council as a member of Smer-SD. He is a member of Committee on Public Administra...")
- 14:54, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:David C.jpg
- 14:54, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Nicole Bricq
- 14:54, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+3,278) . . N Boyko Metodiev Borisov (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left Boyka Metodiev Borisov is the (Bulgarian politician) former Prime Minister and MP of the current National Assembly. He...")
- 14:53, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Nicole Bricq
- 14:53, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+550) . . N Vicente Ferrer Roselló (Created page with "Vicente Ferrer Roselló (born 9 July 1959) is a Spanish Politician. == Political career == Vicente Ferrer has been an MP for the Spanish People's Party (PP), from Valencia,...")
- 14:52, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2,072) . . N Roger Godsiff (Created page with "Roger Duncan Godsiff (born 28 June 1946) is a British Labour politician, who was the Member of Parliament for Birmingham Sparkbrook and Small Heath from 1992 to 2010, when he ...")
- 14:52, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Gerven van, Henk (current)
- 14:52, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Giacomo Stucchi.jpg (current)
- 14:51, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Zuzana Kailova
- 14:50, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,530) . . N James Gray (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|JG.jpg James Whiteside Gray (born 7 November 1954) was first elected as the Member of Parliament (MP) for North Wiltshire in May 1997, an...")
- 14:50, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,065) . . N Zuzana Kailova (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left Zuzana Kailová was born on July 21, 1974, in Ústí nad Labem. She is a Czech politician, since 2008, the Deputy Mayor of th...")
- 14:49, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+606) . . N David Cullinane (Created page with "David Cullinane was born on the 4th of July 1974 in Waterford,Ireland. == Political Career == David Cullinane joined the Oireachtas Committee which represents Jobs, Enterp...")
- 14:49, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:JG.jpg (current)
- 14:49, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+947) . . N Peter Osuský (Created page with "Peter Osuský was born on 11th of October 1953. He is currently a member of the Slovak National Council as a member of SaS. He is a member of Committee on Incompatibility of F...")
- 14:48, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Simone Beissel (Robertson moved page Beissel, Simone to Simone Beissel)
- 14:48, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+28) . . N Beissel, Simone (Robertson moved page Beissel, Simone to Simone Beissel) (current)
- 14:48, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+53) . . Bertel Haarder
- 14:47, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+594) . . N Amparo Ferrando Sendra (Created page with "Amparo Ferrando Sendra (born 25 October 1965) is a Spanish Politician. == Political Career == Amparo Ferrando Sandra has been MP for the Spanish People's Party (PP) from Al...")
- 14:47, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+994) . . N Nicole Bricq (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|French Senator Nicole Bicq Nicole Bricq (born June 10, 1947) is a member of the Senate of France, representing the Seine-et-Marne departm...")
- 14:46, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Bertel Haarder.jpg (current)
- 14:46, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Gilles Baum (Robertson moved page Baum, Gilles to Gilles Baum)
- 14:46, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+25) . . N Baum, Gilles (Robertson moved page Baum, Gilles to Gilles Baum) (current)
- 14:46, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:NBV.jpg (current)
- 14:46, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-57) . . Gilles Baum
- 14:45, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,407) . . N Bertel Haarder (Created page with "Bertel Haarder Geismar (born September 7th, 1944 in Rønshoved) is a Danish politician and MP for the Liberal Party. He has been a minister in several governments. == Politic...")
- 14:45, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+901) . . N Diarmuid Wilson (Created page with "Diarmuid Wilson was born November the 20th 1965. He is an Irish Fianna Fáil politician and member of Seanad Éireann, elected by the Administrative Panel since September 2002...")
- 14:45, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-39) . . Aleksandra TrybuÅ›
- 14:44, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,111) . . N Giuseppe Francesco Maria Marinello (Giuseppe Francesco Maria Marinello)
- 14:43, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+428) . . N Marjan DolinÅ¡ek (Created page with "Marjan Dolinšek (born in 1962) is a member of SMC (Party of Miro Cerar) and a member of the Slovenian National Assembly. == Political career == From 2014 he is a member of...")
- 14:43, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . Agnieszka Pomaska
- 14:42, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+23) . . Agnieszka Pomaska
- 14:42, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+616) . . N Iva Dimic (Created page with "Iva Dimic (born October 28, 1972) is a member of the Slovenian National Assembly and the vice president of the NSi (the New Slovenia-Christian Democrats; Slovenian: Nova Slov...")
- 14:42, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2,571) . . N Martial Bourquin (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|Member of the French Senate Martial Bourquin, born 23 July 1952, is a French politician, born July 23, 1952, current senat...")
- 14:42, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Boiko Borisov Bulgaria.jpg (current)
- 14:41, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Drobinski weiss elvira gross.jpg (current)
- 14:41, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+653) . . N Zakia Khattabi (Created page with "Zakia Khattabi, bon on January 15, 1976 in Saint-Josse, is a Belgian ECOLO politician. == Political Career == She is a MP of the Brussels Region and the French Community a...")
- 14:40, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+668) . . N MarÃa de los Ãngeles Fernández-Ahuja GarcÃa (Created page with "María de los Ángeles Fernández-Ahuja García (born 27 July 1963) is a Spanish Politician. == Political career == María de los Ángeles Fernández-Ahuja has been a MP fo...")
- 14:39, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2,134) . . N Riccardo Conti (Created page with "Riccardo Conti (November 6th, 1947) is an Italian politician and entrepreneur. == Political career == Former member of the Unione dei Democratici Cristiani e Democratici di ...")
- 14:38, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-46) . . Frank Arndt
- 14:38, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+62) . . Bruno Coimbra
- 14:38, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Bruno Coimbra.jpg (current)
- 14:38, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Martial Bourquin.jpg (current)
- 14:37, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+941) . . N Bruno Coimbra (Created page with "Bruno Manuel Pereira Coimbra was born on April 21st, 1981. He currently practices as an environmental engineer. == Political Career == Besides being the Deputy Coordinator of...")
- 14:36, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+857) . . N Marino Germano Mastrangeli (Created page with " == Introduction == Marino Germano Mastrangeli is a member of the Italian Senate for the 17th legislature. == Political Career == Born in 1971 in Lecco, Mastrangeli was ele...")
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)