User contributions
This user is currently blocked. The latest block log entry is provided below for reference:
- 10:31, 21 October 2014 Anjuoh (talk | contribs) blocked Robertson (talk | contribs) with an expiration time of indefinite (account creation disabled, autoblock disabled, email disabled)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 10:18, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Algis Kaseta
- 10:18, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+28) . . Beppe Fenech Adami
- 10:18, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,541) . . N Michael bates, Lord Bates (Created page with " Michael Bates, Lord Bates was born on 26 May 1961. He is a Conservative member of the House of Lords. == Political career == Lord Bates was appointed as the Parliamentary ...")
- 10:17, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,208) . . N Ned O’Sullivan (Created page with " == Introduction == Ned O’Sullivan was born on September 25th, 1950 in County Kerry, Ireland. He is an Irish Fianna Fàil politician and member of Seanad Eirann on the Labou...")
- 10:17, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Dagmar Belakowitsch-Jenewein
- 10:17, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+80) . . Athanasios Pafilis
- 10:17, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Algis Kaseta
- 10:16, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . Haleh Afshar, Baroness Afshar
- 10:16, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+30) . . N Wöginger, August (Robertson moved page Wöginger, August to August Wöginger) (current)
- 10:16, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m August Wöginger (Robertson moved page Wöginger, August to August Wöginger)
- 10:15, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+333) . . Algis Kaseta
- 10:15, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:ΑÏχείο λήψης (23).jpg (current)
- 10:15, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+789) . . N Peter Náhlik (Created page with "Peter Náhlik was born on 18th of August 1981. He is currently a member of the Slovak National Council as a member of Smer-SD. He is a member of Committee on Culture and Media...")
- 10:15, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+143) . . Asdin El Habbassi
- 10:15, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Tonio Fenech (Robertson moved page Fenech, Tonio to Tonio Fenech)
- 10:15, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+26) . . N Fenech, Tonio (Robertson moved page Fenech, Tonio to Tonio Fenech) (current)
- 10:14, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-129) . . Tonio Fenech
- 10:14, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+14) . . Andrew Adonis, Lord Adonis
- 10:14, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,308) . . N Athanasios Pafilis (Created page with "Thanasis Pafilis was born in 1954 in Pitsio, PhthiotisHe is a Greek politician and former Member of the European Parliament for the Communist Party of Greece. == Political Ca...")
- 10:13, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+979) . . N John Whelan (Created page with "John Whelan was born March 24th 1961. He is a member of the Irish Seanad for the Labour Party. == Political Career == Whelan joined the Labour Party in 2010. He was the ca...")
- 10:13, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Annick De Ridder
- 10:13, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+44) . . Victor Olufemi Adebowale, Baron Adebowale
- 10:13, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+46) . . Adam Lipiński
- 10:12, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Albert Fenech (Robertson moved page Fenech, Albert to Albert Fenech)
- 10:12, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+27) . . N Fenech, Albert (Robertson moved page Fenech, Albert to Albert Fenech) (current)
- 10:12, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-55) . . Albert Fenech
- 10:11, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+8) . . Anne Barzin
- 10:11, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,234) . . N Davor Bernardić (Created page with "Davor Bernardić was born on 5 January 1980 in Zagreb. He is a member of the Social Democratic Party of Croatia (SDP; Croatian: Socijaldemokratska partija Hrvatske) and has be...")
- 10:10, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . Ann Brusseel
- 10:10, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+34) . . Dominic Bryce Hubbard
- 10:09, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+553) . . Algis Kaseta
- 10:09, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+8) . . Anke Van dermeersch
- 10:09, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,370) . . N John Steven Bassam, Baron Bassam of Brighton (Created page with " John Steven Bassam was born on 11 June 1953. He is a British Labour and Co-operative politician and member of the House of Lords since 1997. == Political career == He star...")
- 10:09, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+933) . . N Elvira Savino (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|Elvira Savino == Biography == Elvira Savino was born on June 6th 1977 in Castellana Grotte, near Bari, Puglia. She is an It...")
- 10:08, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-8) . . Robert Cutajar
- 10:07, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+19) . . Katherine Patricia Irene Adams, Baroness Adams of Craigielea
- 10:07, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-21) . . Joe Cassar
- 10:06, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+26) . . Jagna Marczułajtis-Walczak
- 10:05, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+633) . . N Mariana Aiveca (Created page with "Mariana Rosa Aiveca was born on February 3rd, 1947. She is an Administrative Assistant and currently she serves as deputy at the Portuguese National Assembly. == Political Ca...")
- 10:05, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,382) . . N Donald Anderson (Created page with " Donald Anderson, Baron Anderson of Swansea, PC, DL (born 17 June 1939, Swansea), is a British Labour Party politician. He was a Member of Parliament for Monmouth from 1966 t...")
- 10:04, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+944) . . N Angelo Tofalo (Created page with "Angelo Tofalo (April 20, 1981) is an Italian politician and engineer. == Education == After a university degree in Civil Engineering, he obtained a further specialization in ...")
- 10:04, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+616) . . N Andrea Gibelli (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left == Introduction == Andrea Gibelli was born 7. September 1967 in Codogno (Lodi), Italy; in June 2013 he was engaged as member ...")
- 10:04, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+46) . . Alastair John Lyndhurst Bruce, Baron Aberdare
- 10:04, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+56) . . Athanasios Ntavlouros
- 10:03, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+747) . . N Dragutin Glavina (Dragutin Glavina)
- 10:03, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Jarosław Gowin
- 10:03, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+512) . . N Franc Golob (Created page with "Franc Golob (born August 2, 1967) is a member of the National Council of the Republic of Slovenia. == Political career == Golob carried out the work of the Mayor of the M...")
- 10:03, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+146) . . Algis Kaseta
- 10:02, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,332) . . N Alberto Losacco (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left == Introduction == Alberto Losacco is a member of parliament of the Italian Chamber of Deputies for the seventeenth legislation. =...")
- 10:02, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Andrea Gibelli.jpg (current)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)