User contributions
This user is currently blocked. The latest block log entry is provided below for reference:
- 10:31, 21 October 2014 Anjuoh (talk | contribs) blocked Robertson (talk | contribs) with an expiration time of indefinite (account creation disabled, autoblock disabled, email disabled)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 09:43, 16 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-457) . . Damianou, Aristos
- 09:37, 16 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-241) . . Costa, Costas
- 09:13, 16 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-45) . . Charalambides, Irene
- 09:03, 16 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-307) . . Antoniou, Antonis
- 09:02, 16 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:SAURA LAPORTA, JOAN.jpg (current)
- 08:53, 16 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+37) . . Adamou, Adamos
- 09:30, 15 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Ralf Brauksiepe
- 09:29, 15 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,037) . . N Marieluise Beck (Created page with "150px|thumbnail|left Marieluise Beck is a member of Alliance 90/The Greens and was born on June 25, 1952, in Bramsche, Germany. She is a teacher....")
- 09:19, 15 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Marieluise Beck.jpg (current)
- 09:15, 15 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Helge Braun
- 09:14, 15 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+800) . . N Helge Braun (Created page with "150px|thumbnail|left Dr. Helge Braun was born on October 1972 in Gießen. He is a physician , and currently works as state minister for the federal c...")
- 09:13, 15 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Helge Braun.jpg (current)
- 09:11, 15 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,086) . . N Ralf Brauksiepe (Created page with "150px|thumbnail|left Dr. Ralf Brauksiepe was born on March 14th, 1967 in Hattingen, Germany. He is an economist , and currently works as a parlia...")
- 15:16, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Ralf Brauksiepe.jpg (current)
- 15:13, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,152) . . N Willi Brase (Created page with "Willi Brase was born on October 10th, 1951 in Quetzen, Germany. He is a member of the SPD and trade union secretary, wholesale businessman, and social worker. == Political Ca...")
- 14:58, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,762) . . N Torsten Albig (Created page with "Torsten Albig, was born in Bremen in 1963. Since 1984 he has been a member of the SPD, a member of the Federal Council and Prime Minister of Schleswig-Holstein since 2012. ...")
- 14:54, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,954) . . N Ilse Aigner (Created page with "Ilse Aigner was born in Feldkirchen-Westerham in 1964. Since 1985 she has been a member of the CSU, and a member of the Federal Council since October 2013. == Political Caree...")
- 14:50, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . Artūras Skardzius
- 14:48, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+981) . . Artūras Skardzius
- 14:26, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+51) . . N Artūras Skardzius (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left")
- 14:26, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Arturas skardzius.jpg (current)
- 14:21, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,449) . . Artūras Paulauskas
- 14:14, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+44) . . N Artūras Paulauskas (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left")
- 14:14, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Paulauskas.jpg (current)
- 14:09, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+958) . . Antanas Nesteckis
- 14:00, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,122) . . N Paschal Donohoe (Created page with "Paschal Donohoe was born on September 29th, 1974 in Dublin, Ireland. == Political Career == He is an Irish Fine Gael politician. He was first elected to Dublin City in 2004,...")
- 13:57, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,041) . . N Regina Doherty (Created page with "Regina Doherty was born January 1971, in Dublin, Ireland. == Political Career == Regina Doherty is a Irish Fine Gael politician. She was elected as a Teachta Dala for the M...")
- 13:55, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+971) . . N Pat Deering (Created page with "Pat Deering was born on February 2nd, 1967 in Rathvilly, County Carlow. == Political Career == He is an Irish Fine Gael politician. He was elected as a Teachta Dala for the...")
- 13:48, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+51) . . N Antanas Nesteckis (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left")
- 13:48, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Antanas nesteckis.jpg (current)
- 13:45, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+825) . . Antanas Matulas
- 13:37, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+860) . . N Jimmy Deenihan TD (Created page with "Jimmy Deenihan was born on September 11th, 1952. He was born in Finuge, Lixnaw, County Kerry. == Political Career == Jimmy Deenihan is an Irish Fine Gael politician and Min...") (current)
- 13:32, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2,501) . . N Lord Carrington (Created page with "The Rt Hon. the Lord Carrington KG GCMG CH MC DL has been a member of the House of Lords since the 4th of April 1941. == Political Career == Peter Carrington succeeded his ...")
- 13:28, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,579) . . N James Newcome (Created page with "James Newcome, The Rt Rev. the Lord Bishop of Carlisle joined the House of Lords on the 3rd of October 2013. == Political Career == The Rt Rev. the Lord Bishop of Carlisle ...")
- 13:25, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,872) . . N Lord Carlile of Berriew (Created page with "Lord Carlile of Berriew has been a Liberal Democrat member of the House of Lords since the 27th July 1999. His full title is: The Lord Carlile of Berriew QC CBE. He has worked...")
- 13:22, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2,177) . . N Baroness Campbell of Surbiton (Created page with "Baroness Campbell of Surbiton is a cross bench member of the House of Lords and was appointed on the 30th March 2007. == Political Career == Baroness Campbell of Surbiton s...")
- 13:21, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+49) . . N Antanas Matulas (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left")
- 13:21, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Antanas matulas.jpg (current)
- 13:20, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,779) . . N Susan Catherine Campbell (Created page with "Susan Catherine Campbell, Baroness Campbell of Loughborough, CBE (born 10 October 1948), is a British sports administrator who has been Chairman of UK Sport since 2003. == Po...")
- 13:18, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Andrius Palionis
- 13:18, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,018) . . N Kenneth John Cameron (Created page with "Kenneth John Cameron, Baron Cameron of Lochbroom FRSE, (born 11 June 1931) is a retired Scottish judge. == Political Career == Lord Cameron of Lochbroom was appointed a Life...")
- 13:17, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+991) . . N Thomas Lyttelton (Created page with "Thomas Lyttelton, born on 12th February 1953, is the 3rd Viscount Chandos and a British politician. == Political Career == Thomas Lyttelton succeeded his father in 1980. Fro...") (current)
- 13:17, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+547) . . Andrius Palionis
- 13:16, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,282) . . N Ewen James Hanning Cameron (Created page with "Ewen James Hanning Cameron, Baron Cameron of Dillington, (born 24 November 1949) is a landowner and life peer who sits as a crossbench member of the House of Lords. == Politi...")
- 13:14, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,170) . . N Martin John Callanan (Created page with "Martin John Callanan or Baron Callanan (born on the 8th August 1961) is a British Conservative Party Politician. == Political Career == Baron Callanan started his political...")
- 13:07, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+50) . . N Andrius Palionis (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left")
- 13:06, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,495) . . N Malcolm Ian Sinclair (Created page with "Malcolm Ian Sinclair, 20th Earl of Caithness, PC (born 3 November 1948) is a British Conservative politician and member of the House of Lords as one of the remaining hereditar...")
- 13:06, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Andrius palionis.jpg (current)
- 13:06, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+886) . . N Stephen Cottrell (Created page with "Stephen Cottrell was born on 31st August 1958 in Leigh-on-Sea, Essex. Since 2010 he is the Bishop of Chelmsford. == Political Career == He joined the House of Lords at the b...")
- 13:04, 14 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,604) . . N The Baroness Byford DBE (Created page with "Hazel Osborne Byford was born on the 14th January and is a Conservative member of the House of Lords. == Political Career == Baroness Byford was appointed Peerage for Life a...")
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)