User contributions
This user is currently blocked. The latest block log entry is provided below for reference:
- 10:31, 21 October 2014 Anjuoh (talk | contribs) blocked Robertson (talk | contribs) with an expiration time of indefinite (account creation disabled, autoblock disabled, email disabled)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 15:09, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+781) . . N Domenico Scilipoti (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left == Introduction == Domenico Scilipoti was born 26th August 1957 in Barcellona Pozzo Di Gotto (Messina), Italy, he lives i...")
- 15:08, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Karamba Diaby
- 15:08, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Pia Dijkstra.jpg (current)
- 15:08, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Anders Samuelsen.jpg (current)
- 15:08, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-26) . . Roelof Bisschop
- 15:08, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+601) . . N Cáit Keane (Created page with "Cáit Keane was born in September 1949 in Galway, Ireland. == Political Career == She was elected to South Dublin County Council for the electoral area of Terenure-Rathfar...")
- 15:07, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,004) . . N Anders Samuelsen (Created page with "Anders Samuelsen (born on 1 August 1967 in Horsens) is a Danish politician, member of the Parliament with the Liberal Alliance and former Member of the European Parliament sit...")
- 15:07, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Gerardo Camps.jpg (current)
- 15:07, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+26) . . N Dijkstra, Pia (Robertson moved page Dijkstra, Pia to Pia Dijkstra) (current)
- 15:07, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Pia Dijkstra (Robertson moved page Dijkstra, Pia to Pia Dijkstra)
- 15:07, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Karamba Diaby
- 15:07, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+30) . . Helena Dalli
- 15:07, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+934) . . N Maurizio Rossi (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left == Introduction == Maurizio Rossi is a member of the Italian Senate. == Political Career == Born in 1957 in Genova,...")
- 15:06, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+69) . . Karamba Diaby
- 15:06, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+848) . . Helena Dalli
- 15:06, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Maurizio-rossi-402x280.jpg (current)
- 15:06, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Magda Berndsen-Jansen
- 15:05, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-32) . . Magda Berndsen-Jansen
- 15:05, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Karamba Diaby 0064.jpg (current)
- 15:05, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+34) . . MarÃa Luz Bajo Prieto
- 15:05, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Domenico Scilipoti.jpg (current)
- 15:04, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,696) . . N Karamba Diaby (Created page with "Karamba Diaby is a German chemist and politician. He is a member of the Social Democratic Party Germany (SPD) == Political Career == He was the Head of the EU project "Empow...")
- 15:04, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . File:Images.jpg (Robertson uploaded a new version of "File:Images.jpg") (current)
- 15:04, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+744) . . N Salvatore Sciascia (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left == Introduction == Salvatore Sciascia was born 21th March 1943 in Moglia (Mantova), Italy, he lives in Segrate (Milan) an...")
- 15:04, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . MarÃa del Mar Baena Azuaga
- 15:03, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Klaas Dijkhoff
- 15:03, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . José Eugenio Azpiroz Villar
- 15:02, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+40) . . Klaas Dijkhoff
- 15:02, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-14) . . David Clarinval
- 15:02, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-35) . . Vera Bergkamp
- 15:02, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+940) . . N Maria Virtudes Cediel Martinez (Created page with "María Virtudes Cediel Martínez is a Spanish politician, member of the Spanish Socialist Worker's Party (PSOE). She was born in Madrid on August 11th, 1957. She became a depu...")
- 15:02, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+32) . . Pedro MarÃa Azpiaz Uriarte
- 15:02, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-13) . . Klaas Dijkhoff
- 15:02, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+26) . . N Dalli, Helena (Robertson moved page Dalli, Helena to Helena Dalli) (current)
- 15:01, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Helena Dalli (Robertson moved page Dalli, Helena to Helena Dalli)
- 15:01, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+831) . . N Herick Manuel Campos Arteseros (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left|Henrick Campos, spanish deputy (PSOE) Born the 12th March 1976 in La Vila Joiosa (Alicante), Henrick Manuel Campos Artesos i...")
- 15:01, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+80) . . Adriano Rafael Moreira
- 15:01, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+3) . . Guillermo Collarte RodrÃguez
- 15:01, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-59) . . Marcel Cheron
- 15:01, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . File:Klaas.jpg (Robertson uploaded a new version of "File:Klaas.jpg") (current)
- 15:01, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+84) . . Prokopios Pavlopoulos
- 15:01, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Adriano Rafael Moreira.jpg (current)
- 15:00, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+952) . . N Adriano Rafael Moreira (Created page with "Adriano Rafael de Sousa Moreira was born on August 17th, 1965. He currently practices as lawyer. == Political Career == This is his second mandate as a deputy at the National...")
- 15:00, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:HEnRICK CAMPOS.jpg (current)
- 15:00, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-61) . . Olivier Chastel
- 15:00, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+14) . . José Luis Ayllón Manso
- 15:00, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:ΑÏχείο λήψης (1).jpg (current)
- 15:00, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-299) . . Klaas Dijkhoff
- 14:59, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,061) . . N Paolo Galimberti (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|Paolo Galimberti Paolo Galimberti has served the Italian Parliament as Senator representing the region Lombardy since 2013....")
- 14:59, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+33) . . Juan Carlos Corcuera Plaza
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)