User contributions
This user is currently blocked. The latest block log entry is provided below for reference:
- 10:31, 21 October 2014 Anjuoh (talk | contribs) blocked Robertson (talk | contribs) with an expiration time of indefinite (account creation disabled, autoblock disabled, email disabled)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 14:39, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Ana Oliveira
- 14:39, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+521) . . N LuÃs Menezes (Created page with "Luís Filipe Valenzuela Tavares Menezes Lopes was born on December 20th, 1980. He currently practices as an economist and he also is a Portuguese politician. == Political Car...")
- 14:38, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-9) . . Ana Oliveira
- 14:37, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+909) . . N Cipriá CÃscar Casabán (Created page with "Cipriá Císcar Casabán is a Spanish politician, member of the Spanish Socialist Worker's Party (PSOE). He was born in Picaya (Valencia) on December 22th, 1946. == Politica...")
- 14:37, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Ana Catarina Mendonça Mendes
- 14:37, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Celso LuÃs Delgado Arce (current)
- 14:36, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,692) . . N Joram van Klaveren (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left|Joram van Klaveren (Bontes/Van Klaveren) Member of the Dutch House of Representatives Joram van Klaveren (born on January 23th...")
- 14:36, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-4) . . Amadeu Soares Albergaria
- 14:35, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+3) . . Eloy Suárez Lamata
- 14:35, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+14) . . Rudolf Chmel
- 14:34, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Evarist Bartolo (Robertson moved page Bartolo, Evarist to Evarist Bartolo)
- 14:34, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+29) . . N Bartolo, Evarist (Robertson moved page Bartolo, Evarist to Evarist Bartolo) (current)
- 14:34, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-29) . . Altino Bessa (current)
- 14:34, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+810) . . N Viera Tomanová (Created page with "Viera Tomanová was born on 5rd of February 1948. She is currently a member of Slovak National Council as member of Smer-SD and also of Committee on Social Affairs. == Politic...")
- 14:33, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Eijsink, Angelien
- 14:33, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,478) . . N Dorothee Bär (Dorothee Bär)
- 14:33, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-18) . . Miroslav ČÞ
- 14:33, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-85) . . Eijsink, Angelien
- 14:32, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+3) . . MarÃa Cristina Suárez-Bárcena Blasco
- 14:31, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . Eijsink, Angelien
- 14:31, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:WLP14-ri-0844- Dorothee Bär (CSU), MdB.jpg (current)
- 14:31, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Joramklaveren.JPG (current)
- 14:31, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-34) . . Rastislav Čepák
- 14:31, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+13) . . LuÃs Leite Ramos
- 14:31, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+772) . . N Teresa Cunillera i Mestres (Created page with "Born in Bell-Lloch d'Urgell (Lleida) in 1951. == Political Career == Member of the Socialist Party of Catalonia, agreed to deputy status in 1979 In 1986 granted the State Adm...")
- 14:30, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+60) . . Ana Oliveira
- 14:30, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Antoni Such Botella
- 14:30, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+397) . . Eijsink, Angelien (Alot)
- 14:30, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-43) . . DuÅ¡an ÄŒaploviÄ
- 14:30, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Ana Oliveira.jpg (current)
- 14:29, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+622) . . N Ana Oliveira (Created page with "Ana Elisabete Laborda Oliveira was born on April 10th, 1984. She currently practices as a high technician- == Political Career == Besides being a deputy from the Municipal As...")
- 14:28, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+59) . . Agni Kalogeri
- 14:28, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Images (2).jpg (current)
- 14:27, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-30) . . LuÃs Fazenda
- 14:27, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-442) . . m Helena Dalli
- 14:27, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+962) . . N Agni Kalogeri (Created page with "Agni Kalogeri was born in Kolwezi in 1966. She is a Greek politician and agronomist. She elected Member of Samos prefecture with SY.RIZ.A in the elections of June 2012. == Po...")
- 14:27, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,196) . . N Petr Bendl (Created page with "Petr Bendl (born on 24th January 1966) is a Czech politician, who served as Minister of Agriculture from October 2011 to July 2013. He has been member of the Chamber of Deput...")
- 14:25, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-123) . . Grech, Etienne
- 14:25, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+731) . . N Norbert Klein (Created page with "Norbert Klein (born on March 1st, 1956 in Hengelo) is a member of the Dutch House of Representatives for the 50PLUS/Klein. == Political Career == As a member of 50PLUS Norbe...")
- 14:25, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,577) . . N Mike Gapes (Created page with "Michael John "Mike" Gapes is born on the 4th of September 1952 in Essex, England. He is a British Labour Co-operative politician who has been the Member of Parliament for Ilfo...")
- 14:25, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Statni pohreb Vaclava Havla 23.12.2011 062.jpg (current)
- 14:25, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+756) . . N Eva Longo (Created page with " Eva Longo is an Italian professor and politician. She was born in Pellezzano, Salerno, Campania, on January 8th 1949. She has served the Italian Parliament as Senator represe...")
- 14:24, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+699) . . N LuÃs Leite Ramos (Created page with "Luís Manuel Morais Leite Ramos was born on October 29th, 1961. He currently practices as University Professor and Portuguese Politician. == Political Career == He is Social ...")
- 14:24, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+67) . . Rudolf Chmel
- 14:24, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+711) . . N Giancarlo Serafini (Created page with "== Introduction == Giancarlo Serafini was born 02. March 1941 in Rivoli (Torino), Italy; he works as union organizer. He was appointed during the XVI and XVII Senate Legislat...")
- 14:23, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Montserrat Surroca i Comas
- 14:23, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Rudolf Chmel.jpg (current)
- 14:23, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . MarÃa Jesús Susinos Tarrero
- 14:22, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,535) . . N Rudolf Chmel (Created page with "Rudolf Chmel is a Slovak politician, who was the Minister of Culture from 2002 to 2005 and again in 2006. He was a writer and editor. He was born 11.2.1939. He stood for a sea...")
- 14:21, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . Reinette Klever
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)