User contributions
This user is currently blocked. The latest block log entry is provided below for reference:
- 10:31, 21 October 2014 Anjuoh (talk | contribs) blocked Robertson (talk | contribs) with an expiration time of indefinite (account creation disabled, autoblock disabled, email disabled)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 10:25, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,118) . . N Alexander Cerny (Created page with "Alexander Cerny (born on 21th May 1953) is Czech politician. He has been member of the Chamber of Deputies Parliament of Czech Republic since 26. 10. 2013. He was elected on t...")
- 10:24, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+303) . . Odón Elorza González
- 10:23, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+498) . . N László Sólymos (Created page with "László Solymos was born on 16th of November 1968. He is currently a member of Slovak National Council as a member of Most-Híd. He is member of Committee for Culture and Med...")
- 10:22, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Dominic Grieve
- 10:22, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+66) . . Arménio Santos
- 10:22, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Nicola Morra.jpg (current)
- 10:21, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Arménio Santos.jpg (current)
- 10:21, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+380) . . N Boris Susko (Created page with "Boris Susko was born on 26th of May 1970. He is currently a member of Slovak National Council as a member of Smer-SD. He is member of Constitutional Committee. == Education ==...")
- 10:21, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Odon.jpg (current)
- 10:21, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+831) . . N Arménio Santos (Created page with "Arménio dos Santos was born on November 22nd, 1945. He is a retired bank employee. == Political Career == Secretary-General of the TSD; Deputy Mayor of Loures without portf...")
- 10:21, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+652) . . N Odón Elorza González (Created page with " Born in San Sebastian, on April 4, 1955 == Political Career == He was elected first councilor for PSE-PSOE in San Sebastian in the municipal elections of 1979, a position h...")
- 10:20, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+4,444) . . N JarosÅ‚aw Gowin (Created page with "thumbnail|left|Jarosław Gowin.PIolska Razem.Member of the Parliament Jarosław Gowin wasborn 4 December 1961. He is a Polish conservative politi...")
- 10:19, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Paavo Arhinmäki (Robertson moved page Arhinmäki, Paavo to Paavo Arhinmäki)
- 10:19, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+30) . . N Arhinmäki, Paavo (Robertson moved page Arhinmäki, Paavo to Paavo Arhinmäki) (current)
- 10:19, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+680) . . N Aivar Kokk (Created page with "Aivar Kokk (born April 15, 1960 Jõgeval) is an Estonian entrepreneur and politician, Member of Parliament XII. == Political career == Kokk has been an entrepreneur since 19...")
- 10:17, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Marcouch.jpg (current)
- 10:16, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-27) . . Giovanna Mangili
- 10:15, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:NB3.jpg (current)
- 10:14, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-2,908) . . Sirkka-Liisa Anttila
- 10:13, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+8) . . Francesco Molinari
- 10:13, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,135) . . N Josef Nekl (Created page with "Josef Nekl (born on 28th May 1953) is Czech politician. He has been member of the Chamber of Deputies Parliament of Czech Republic since 26. 10. 2013. He was elected on the sl...")
- 10:12, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-17) . . Bruno Marton
- 10:09, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Michela Montevecchi
- 10:09, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-1,806) . . Gerda Hasselfeldt (Gerda Hasselfeldt)
- 10:09, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,261) . . N Peter Gauweiler (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|Peter Gauweiler (CDU/CSU) Member of German Parliament Peter Gauweiler (born June 22, 1949 in Munich, Bavaria) is a German po...")
- 10:08, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-9) . . Carlo Martelli
- 10:08, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,308) . . N Atanas Todorov Merdjanov (Created page with "Atanas Todorov Merdjanov is a Bulgarian Politician and MP at the Bulgarian parliament. He was born on 3th September 1963 in Elhovo. == Political Career == Currently, Atanasov...")
- 10:07, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+72) . . António Rodrigues
- 10:07, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+66) . . Michela Montevecchi
- 10:07, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:António Rodrigues.jpg (current)
- 10:07, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+748) . . N Marit Maij (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left Marit Maij was born on the 16th of January 1972 in Apeldoorn. She is a politician in the Dutch House of Representatives for the Labour P...")
- 10:07, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+3,389) . . N Gerda Hasselfeldt (Gerda Hasselfeldt)
- 10:07, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+765) . . N António Rodrigues (Created page with "António Costa Rodrigues was born on May 30th, 1958. He currently practices as a lawyer. == Political Career == This is António Rodrigues’ second mandate as a deputy at th...")
- 10:06, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+412) . . N Philippe Goffin (Created page with "Philippe Goffin, born in Rocourt on April 1, 1967, is a Belgian-Walloon MR politician and entrepreneur. == Political Career == Goffin became Mayor of the town of Crisné...")
- 10:06, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Elisa Bulgarelli
- 10:05, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,078) . . N Michela Montevecchi (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|Michela Montevecchi == Biography == Michela Antonia Montevecchi was born on April 21st 1971 in Bologna. She is an Ita...")
- 10:05, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:1024px-Gerda Hasselfeldt 2013.jpg (current)
- 10:05, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+820) . . N Adam kwiatkowski (Created page with " Adam Kwiatkowski was born 7th december 1972 in Warsaw. He is a Polish politician == Political career == At the beginning of his political career he was an adviser for Jaro...")
- 10:05, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-11) . . Nunziante Consiglio
- 10:04, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Sirkka-Liisa Anttila (Robertson moved page Anttila, Sirkka-Liisa to Sirkka-Liisa Anttila)
- 10:04, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+34) . . N Anttila, Sirkka-Liisa (Robertson moved page Anttila, Sirkka-Liisa to Sirkka-Liisa Anttila) (current)
- 10:04, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Claude Adam (Robertson moved page Adam, Claude to Claude Adam)
- 10:04, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+25) . . N Adam, Claude (Robertson moved page Adam, Claude to Claude Adam) (current)
- 10:04, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . Jonny Crosio
- 10:03, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Aare Heinvee
- 10:03, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Aare Heinvee
- 10:02, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . Antonio Gentile
- 10:02, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+70) . . Margarida Almeida
- 10:02, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:JAROSLAW GOWIN.jpg (current)
- 10:01, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Margarida Almeida.jpg (current)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)