User contributions
This user is currently blocked. The latest block log entry is provided below for reference:
- 10:31, 21 October 2014 Anjuoh (talk | contribs) blocked Robertson (talk | contribs) with an expiration time of indefinite (account creation disabled, autoblock disabled, email disabled)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 12:50, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,225) . . N LubomÃr Franc (Created page with "Lubomir Franc was born on August 28, 1953, in Broumov. He is a regional politician of Social Democrats, since November 2008 the regional county president of the Hradec Králov...")
- 12:48, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . Odón Elorza González (current)
- 12:47, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+598) . . N Paola Nugnes (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|Paola Nugnes == Biography == Paolo Nugnes was born on October 23rd in Napoli, Campania. She is an italian political and she ...")
- 12:45, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-217) . . Gabriel Elorriaga Pisarik (current)
- 12:44, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+853) . . N Nada BrinovÅ¡ek (Created page with "Nada Brinovšek (born April 24, 1961) is a member of the Slovenian National Assembly and a member of the Slovenian Democratic Party (SDS; Slovenian: Slovenska demokratska stra...")
- 12:43, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+838) . . N Gwenaëlle Grovonius (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left|Grovonius Gwenaëlle Gwenaëlle Grovonius, born in Namur (Belgium) on October 16, 1978, is a Belgian PS politician and ...")
- 12:40, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Thomas Blomqvist (Robertson moved page Blomqvist, Thomas to Thomas Blomqvist)
- 12:40, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+30) . . N Blomqvist, Thomas (Robertson moved page Blomqvist, Thomas to Thomas Blomqvist) (current)
- 12:38, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:John Glen.jpg (current)
- 12:38, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+62) . . Martin Dörmann
- 12:38, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:M. dormann.jpeg (current)
- 12:38, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:KILLION MUNYAMA.jpg (current)
- 12:36, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . Martin Dörmann
- 12:36, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+64) . . Joseph Muscat
- 12:36, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+832) . . N Martin Dörmann (Created page with "Martin Dörmann is Lawyer and a German politician. He is a member of the Social Democratic Party of Germany (SPD) == Political Career == Dörmann has been a member of the SPD...")
- 12:36, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:MUSCAT-JOSEPH.jpg (current)
- 12:34, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-1,862) . . Jouni Backman
- 12:33, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+808) . . N Boris Tsvetkov Tsvetkov (Created page with "Boris Tsvetkov Tsvetkov is a Bulgarian politician and MP of the 42nd National Assembly of the Republic of Bulgaria. He was on 25 November 1973. He has been a lecturer, and spe...")
- 12:33, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-37) . . Joe Mizzi
- 12:31, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+9) . . MarÃa Luisa SantÃn González
- 12:31, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+485) . . N MarÃa Luisa SantÃn González (Created page with "Born November 29, 1956 in León. == Political Career == She was Mayor of the Municipality of Vega de Valcarce (1999 to date) and Councillor Bierzo County Council (1999-2011)....")
- 12:31, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-10) . . Konrad Mizzi
- 12:29, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+723) . . N Denis Ducarme (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left|Denis Ducarme (MR) Member of the Belgian Chamber of Representatives Denis Ducarme (Watermaal-Bosvoorde, 23 October 1973) is a ...")
- 12:26, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Paola Nugnes.jpg (current)
- 12:24, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+738) . . N Sebastián González Vázquez (Created page with "Born January 20, 1956 in Adrada (Ávila). == Political Career == He was Alderman of the City of Avila (1987-2004). Afterthat he was President of the Council of Ávila (199...")
- 12:24, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+770) . . N Milan Brglez (Created page with "Milan Brglez (born September 1, 1967) is the President of Slovenian National Assembly and vice president of the SMC (The Party of Miro Cerar; Slovene: Stranka Mira Cerarja). ...")
- 12:23, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Andreas Psycharis (current)
- 12:22, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Andreas Psycharis
- 12:22, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+675) . . N Andrea Petru (Created page with " Andrea Petru (born on 28th November 1949 in Arad) is a Romanian politician and he´s also a member of the Romanian Parliament. == Political career == In the period 1983...")
- 12:21, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,718) . . N Andreas Psycharis (Created page with " Andreas Psycharis (Greek: Ανδρέας Ψυχάρης, born in August 1967, in Athens, Greece) is a Greek politician and diplomat. He serves as a Member of the Hellenic Par...")
- 12:21, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Denis Ducarme.jpg (current)
- 12:16, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Marta González Vásquez
- 12:16, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,117) . . N Marta González Vásquez (Created page with "Born January 25, 1965 in Santiago de Compostela. == Political Career == She was General Director of the Equality Galician Xunta de Galicia (2003-2005). she was also General S...")
- 12:15, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+551) . . N Benoît Dispa (Created page with " Benoît Dispa (Namur, 18 September 1963) is a Belgian Francophone politician and member of the democratic-christian party cdH. == Political career == Since 2014 Dispa is a...")
- 12:11, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-33) . . Vilma Moronese
- 11:15, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+64) . . Robert Biedroń
- 11:08, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+42) . . Piotr Bauć
- 11:02, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+538) . . N Bilyana Yordanova Bekova (Created page with "Bilyana Yordanova Bekova is Bulgarian Politician and MP born on 13 Nov, 1976 in Sofia. == Political Career == Bekova has a seat in the Parliamentary Group of GERB at the 42nd ...")
- 11:00, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-11) . . Franc Breznik
- 10:59, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+894) . . N Ján Podmanický (Created page with "Ján Podmanický was born on 17th of May 1977. He is currently a member of Slovak National Council as a member of Smer-SD. He is a chairman of Committee on Social Affairs. He ...")
- 10:59, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,074) . . N Jiri Holecek (Created page with "Jiri Holecek was born on April 26, 1972. He is a Czech politician and businessman, from October 2013 Member of the Chamber of Deputies and member of the movement ANO 2011. ==...")
- 10:58, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+22) . . Vilma Moronese
- 10:58, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Alenka Bratušek
- 10:57, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+28) . . Atanas Zarifov Zarifov
- 10:57, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+571) . . N Vilma Moronese (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|Vilma Moronese == Biography == Vilma Moronose was born on May 31st 1971 in Santa Maria Capua Vetere (Caserta, Campania). S...")
- 10:56, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+26) . . Anastasios Nerantzis
- 10:56, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . SreÄko BlažiÄ
- 10:55, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+84) . . Atanas Todorov Merdjanov
- 10:54, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+24) . . Andreas Koutsoumpas
- 10:54, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Indrek Saar EST.jpg (current)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)