User contributions
This user is currently blocked. The latest block log entry is provided below for reference:
- 10:31, 21 October 2014 Anjuoh (talk | contribs) blocked Robertson (talk | contribs) with an expiration time of indefinite (account creation disabled, autoblock disabled, email disabled)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 16:48, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Patrik Kuncar
- 16:48, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . LubomÃr Franc
- 16:47, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Jiri Holecek
- 16:47, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Jana Pastuchova
- 16:39, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Werner Janssen
- 15:39, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+854) . . N Chterio Chtherev Chtherev (Created page with "Chterio Chtherev Chtherev is a politician and PM at the 42 Natioanal Assembly fo the Republic of Bulgaria. He was born on 7 June 1955 in Golyamo Vranovo. == Political Career =...")
- 15:28, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,090) . . N Damian Green (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left|DG.jpg Damian Green (born 17 January 1956) is a British politician who has been the Conservative Member of Parliament (MP) for Ashford s...")
- 15:27, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,971) . . N Helen Goodman (Created page with "Helen Catherine Goodman (born 2 January 1958) is a British Labour Party politician, who has been the Member of Parliament (MP) for Bishop Auckland since 2005, and was the Parl...")
- 15:26, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+948) . . N Deirdre Clune (Created page with "Deirdre Clune was born on the 1st of June, 1959 in Cork, Ireland. == Political Career == She used to be Senator and Seanad Spokesperson on Enterprise, Jobs & Innovation. Ad...")
- 15:23, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+753) . . N Jelka Godec (Created page with "Jelka Godec (born November 21, 1969) is a member of SDS (Slovenian Democratic Party) and a membert of the Slovenian National Assembly. == Political career == She is an act...")
- 15:23, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,037) . . N Ante Babić (Created page with "Ante Babić was born on May 26, 1966 in Trier, Federal Republic of Germany. He is a member of the Croatian Parliament (Hrvatski Sabor) and a member of the Croatian Democratic ...")
- 15:21, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:DG.jpg (current)
- 15:20, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+563) . . Geurts, Jaco (current)
- 15:19, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+853) . . N Matjaž Han (Created page with "Matjaž Han (born January 17, 1971) is a member of the Slovenian National Assembly and a member of the Social Democrats (SD; Slovenian: Socialni demokrati). == Political car...")
- 15:19, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,122) . . N Bozena Sekaninova (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left Bozena Sekaninova was born on October 4, 1957, in the city of Sternberk. She is a Czech politician, a Senator for Prostejov...")
- 15:19, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,718) . . N Tom Greatrex (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left|TG.jpg Thomas James Greatrex (born 30 September 1974) is a British Labour Co-operative politician, who has been the Member of Parliament ...")
- 15:19, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+636) . . N Byunyamin Hyusein Hasan (Created page with "He is a politician taking seat in the 42th National Assembly of the Republic of Bulgaria from the Political Group of the Movement for Rights and Freedom. He was born on 23 Nov...")
- 15:18, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . File:TG.jpg (Robertson uploaded a new version of "File:TG.jpg") (current)
- 15:17, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+81) . . David Norris
- 15:17, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+593) . . N Domenico De Siano (Created page with "Domenico De Siano (September 15, 1958) is an Italian politician and entrepreneur. == Political career == In 2013 he was elected for Popolo della Libertà party. He is part of...")
- 15:16, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Jaanus Tamkivi EST.jpg (current)
- 15:15, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2,127) . . N Eamonn Coghlan (Created page with "Eamonn Coghlan was born November the 21st 1952, in Drimnagh, Dublin. He is a former olympic athlete and current member of the Seanad and part of the Fain Gael party. == Poli...")
- 15:15, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,410) . . N Zac Goldsmith (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|Zac Goldsmith Frank Zacharias Robin Goldsmith (born 20 January 1975) is a British Conservative politician and journalist who h...")
- 15:15, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:DN.jpg (current)
- 15:13, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+504) . . N David Norris (Created page with "David Norris == Political Career == He is the independent Senator for the University of Dublin. He is also a representative of the graduates of Trinity College Dublin in th...")
- 15:13, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:TG.jpg
- 15:12, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,347) . . N Anna Karamanli (Created page with " Anna Karamanli (Greek: Άννα Καραμανλή, born in Thessaloniki, Greece) is a Greek politician and journalist. She is a Member of the Hellenic Parliament at the seco...")
- 15:12, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+383) . . Darragh O'Brien
- 15:11, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+722) . . N Tomaž Gantar (Created page with "Tomaž Gantar (born March 21, 1960 in Koper) is a former slovenian Minister of Health and a member of the Slovenian National Assembly. == Political career == From 2006 until...")
- 15:09, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+938) . . N Marco Scibona (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|Marco Scibona == Biography == Marco Scibona was born on June 8th 1967 in Wald (Switzerland), he moved to Bussoleno (Turin, ...")
- 15:06, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,305) . . N Chris Grayling (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left|CG.JPG Chris Grayling (born 1 April 1962) has been the Conservative MP for Epsom and Ewell since 2001, and has been the Lord Chancellor a...")
- 15:06, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . File:CG.JPG (Robertson uploaded a new version of "File:CG.JPG") (current)
- 15:03, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+896) . . N Meryame Kitir (Created page with "Meryame Kitir, born on April 20, 1980 in Maasmechelen, is a Belgian politician for sp.a (Socialist Party). In addition, she works since 1999 as a laborer at Ford Genk, where s...")
- 15:03, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,057) . . N Maria Mussini (Created page with " == Introduction == Maria Mussini is a member of the Italian Senate for the 17th legislature. == Political Career == Born in 1967 in Reggio Emilia and graduated at Bologna ...")
- 15:00, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+59) . . Birgitte Josefsen
- 14:59, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Birgitte Josefsen.jpg (current)
- 14:58, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+540) . . Gesthuizen, Sharon (current)
- 14:58, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Xabier Mikel Errekondo
- 14:58, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Zac Goldsmith.jpg (current)
- 14:58, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Bozena Sekaninova.jpg (current)
- 14:58, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,102) . . N Xabier Mikel Errekondo (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left|Member of the Spanish Parliament (AMAIUR) Xabier Mikel Errekondo Saltsamendi was born Usúrbil, Guipúzcoa, 12 de agosto in 1964. ==...")
- 14:57, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,060) . . N Luigi D'Ambrosio Lettieri (Created page with "Luigi D'Ambrosio Lettieri (December 3, 1955) is an Italian politician and pharmacist. He is president of the Pharmacists Order of Bari. == Political career == Elected in the ...")
- 14:57, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+857) . . N Birgitte Josefsen (Created page with "Birgitte Josefsen (born in 1951) is an MP for the Liberal Party. == Political career == She has been a member of the regional council in North Jutland County from 1994 to...")
- 14:57, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+558) . . N Marko Ferluga (Created page with "Marko Ferluga (born October 5, 1967) is a member of the Slovenian National Assembly and a member of SMC (Party of Miro Cerar). == Political career == He is a member of the ...")
- 14:56, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . David Cullinane
- 14:56, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:CG.JPG
- 14:56, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . Nicole Bricq
- 14:56, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . File:David C.jpg (Robertson uploaded a new version of "File:David C.jpg") (current)
- 14:56, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+485) . . Nicole Bricq
- 14:56, 2 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+56) . . Bruno Dias
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)