User contributions
This user is currently blocked. The latest block log entry is provided below for reference:
- 10:31, 21 October 2014 Anjuoh (talk | contribs) blocked Robertson (talk | contribs) with an expiration time of indefinite (account creation disabled, autoblock disabled, email disabled)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 08:15, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-95) . . Joseba Andoni Agirretxea Urresti
- 08:12, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-24) . . José Luis Ãbalos Meco
- 08:12, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-76) . . Werner Amon (Proofreading)
- 08:11, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-26) . . Juan Antonio Abad Pérez
- 08:06, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Frantisek Amadek
- 08:04, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . Ivan Adamec
- 08:03, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-3) . . Vojtech Adam
- 08:02, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-13) . . Marketa Adamova
- 07:59, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-3) . . Christian Brotcorne
- 07:55, 30 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+9) . . Maurizio Gasparri (Minor proofreading)
- 15:31, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+704) . . N Maurizio Gasparri (Created page with " Maurizio Gasparri has served the Italian Parliament as Senator representing the region Lazio since 2013. He was born in Roma, Lazio, on July 18th 1956. He is the Vice Preside...")
- 15:28, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+814) . . N Jose Luis Centella Gomez (Created page with "José Luis Centella Gómez is a Spanish politician, the secretary-general of the Spanish Communist Party (PCE). He was born in Cordoba on July 31st, 1958. He was elected Congr...")
- 15:27, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,067) . . N Ane Halsboe-Jørgensen (Created page with "Ane Halsboe-Jørgensen (born 4th of May 1983) is a member of the Parliament for the Social Democratic Party in North Jutland greater constituency from September 15th 2011. ==...")
- 15:21, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+608) . . N Catherine Noone (Created page with "Catherine Noone was born in June 1976 in the Irish town of Mayo, Ireland and speaks fluent Italian. == Political Career == She was a member of Dublin City Council from 20...")
- 15:21, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+714) . . N Manuela Repetti (Created page with "== Introduction == Manuela Repetti was born 17th December 1966 in Novi Ligure (Alessandria), Italy, where she was working as businesswoman. She was appointed during the XVI Ch...")
- 15:20, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,027) . . N Vincenzo Gibiino (Created page with " Vincenzo Gibiino has served the Italian Parliament as Senator representing the region Sicily since 2013. He was born in San Gregorio di Catania, Sicily, on January 4th 1965. ...")
- 15:20, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+62) . . Acácio Pinto
- 15:20, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,291) . . N Hana Aulická JÃrovcová (Created page with "Hana Aulická Jírovcová (born on 7th April 1981) is Czech politician. He has been member of the Chamber of Deputies Parliament of Czech Republic since 26. 10. 2013. He was e...")
- 15:19, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Acácio Pinto.jpg (current)
- 15:19, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-18) . . Betty de Boer
- 15:19, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,058) . . N Acácio Pinto (Created page with "Acácio Santos da Fonseca Pinto was born on May 14th, 1959. He currently practices as a secondary school teacher == Political Career == Besides being the President of the int...")
- 15:19, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-23) . . Deo Debattista
- 15:19, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-3) . . Betty de Boer
- 15:18, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,045) . . N Lorraine Higgins (Created page with "==Introduction== Lorraine Higgins was born on 3rd August 1979. She is an Irish barrister and Labour Party politician. ==Political career== Higgins is currently the Labour Par...")
- 15:18, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Carles Campuzano.jpg (current)
- 15:18, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . Kerstin Andreae
- 15:15, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+764) . . N Andreas Steenberg (Created page with " Andreas Steenberg(born 22 July 1983 in Randers)is a member of Parliament for the Social Liberal Party in Western Jutland greater constituency from September 15th 2011. == Po...")
- 15:15, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Dusanbublavy.png (current)
- 15:15, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-387) . . Pia Dijkstra
- 15:14, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+758) . . N Francesco Scoma (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left == Introduction == Francesco Scoma was born 25th August 1961 in Palermo, Italy, and works as managing director of the Unicre...")
- 15:14, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+50) . . Giacomo Caliendo
- 15:13, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+28) . . N Debattista, Deo (Robertson moved page Debattista, Deo to Deo Debattista) (current)
- 15:13, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Deo Debattista (Robertson moved page Debattista, Deo to Deo Debattista)
- 15:13, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-5) . . AgustÃn Conde Bajén
- 15:13, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,268) . . N Gerardo Camps Devesa (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left|Gerardo Camps Devesa, spanish deputy for the People's Party Gerardo Camps Devesa (born 30 June 1963 in Barcelona) is a Spanis...")
- 15:13, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-305) . . AgustÃn Conde Bajén
- 15:12, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+58) . . Adão Silva
- 15:12, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+561) . . N Péter Vörös (Created page with "Péter Vörös was born on 3rd of April 1966 in Gbelce. He is currently a member of Slovak National Council as member of Most-Híd and of Committee on Social Affairs. == Educa...")
- 15:12, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+843) . . N Labhrás Ó Murchú (Created page with " ==Introduction== Labhrás Ó Murchú was born on 14th August 1939. He is the Director-General of Comhaltas Ceoltóirí Éíreann, and a member of Seanad Éireann for Fianna F...")
- 15:12, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Giacomo Caliendo.jpg (current)
- 15:11, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-537) . . Agnes Alpers
- 15:11, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Adão Silva.jpg (current)
- 15:11, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . Agnes Alpers
- 15:11, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,025) . . N Adão Silva (Created page with "Adão José Fonseca Silva was born on October 1st, 1957. He currently practices as a teacher. == Political Career == Besides being the President of the District Policy Commit...")
- 15:11, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Francesco Scoma.jpg (current)
- 15:10, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+3) . . Karamba Diaby
- 15:09, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+3) . . Anders Samuelsen
- 15:09, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+650) . . N Frédéric Daerden (Created page with " Frédéric Daerden (Montegnée, 11 January 1970) is a Belgian politician and member of the French-speaking Socialist Party. == Political career == Daerden is mayor of Herst...")
- 15:09, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+740) . . N Eddy van Hijum (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left|Eddy van Hijum (CDA) Member of the Dutch House of Representatives Eddy van Hijum (born on April 17th, 1972 in Delft) is a member of th...")
- 15:09, 29 September 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+68) . . Anders Samuelsen
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)