User contributions
This user is currently blocked. The latest block log entry is provided below for reference:
- 10:31, 21 October 2014 Anjuoh (talk | contribs) blocked Robertson (talk | contribs) with an expiration time of indefinite (account creation disabled, autoblock disabled, email disabled)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 09:03, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+15) . . Svetlana PavloviÄová
- 09:03, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+927) . . N Maria das Mercês Borges (Created page with "Maria das Mercês Gomes Borges da Silva Soares was born on July 15th, 1957. She currently practices as Portuguese Parliamentarian and also as Superior Technic Consultant of th...")
- 09:03, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+660) . . N Catarina Marcelino (Created page with "Catarina Marcelino Rosa da Silva was born on January 25th, 1971. She currently practices as an anthropologist. == Political Career == This is Catarina Marcelino’s second ma...")
- 09:02, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Arcangelo Sannicandro.jpg (current)
- 09:01, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2,238) . . N Feargal Quinn (Created page with "Feargal Quinn was born November the 27th 1936. He is an indipendent member of the Seanad Éireann. He has also been active as a businessman and a television personality. ==...")
- 09:01, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+541) . . N Jaroslav Demian (Created page with "Jaroslav Demian (born on the 6th of February in 1963)is a MP of the National Council of the Slovak republic. He stood for a seat of SMER-SD in Brezno. == Political career ==...")
- 09:00, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-54) . . Kristy Debono
- 09:00, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+38) . . Pavol Paška
- 08:59, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Heikki Autto
- 08:59, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Perjan Moors
- 08:58, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+701) . . N Perjan Moors (Created page with "Perjan Moors was born on the 20th of October 1967 in Nijmegen. He is a member of the Dutch House of Representatives for the People's Party for Freedom and Democracy (VVD). =...")
- 08:57, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Andrzej Czerwiński.JPG (current)
- 08:57, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Milan PanáÄek
- 08:56, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,412) . . N Ante Sanader (Created page with "Ante Sanader was born on May 17, 1960 in Dugobabe near Klis, Croatia. He is a member of the Croatian Parliament (Hrvatski Sabor) and a member of the Croatian Democratic Party ...")
- 08:55, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+18) . . Giovanna Debono
- 08:54, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+14) . . Paavo Arhinmäki
- 08:53, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+77) . . Antonio Placido
- 08:53, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+44) . . Peter Osuský
- 08:53, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+8) . . Carlos São Martinho
- 08:53, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Miroslav Grebenicek.jpg (current)
- 08:53, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+148) . . Anna Mani Papadimitriou
- 08:52, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+76) . . Carlos São Martinho
- 08:52, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-13) . . Sirkka-Liisa Anttila
- 08:52, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-96) . . Mario de Marco
- 08:52, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Carlos São Martinho.jpg (current)
- 08:51, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+595) . . N Carlos São Martinho (Created page with "Carlos Manuel Faia São Martinho Gomes was born on July 18th, 1956. He currently practices as an economist. == Political Career == This is Carlos São Martinho’s second man...")
- 08:50, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+627) . . N Anna Mani Papadimitriou (Created page with "Anna Mani Papadimitriou (Greek: Άννα Μάνη Παπαδημητρίου, born 18 August 1964 in Katerini, Greece) is a Greek politician and lawyer. == Political Career...")
- 08:50, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+81) . . Alexandra Papariga
- 08:50, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,353) . . N Andrzej Biernat (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left Andrzej Biernat was born 11 September 1960 in Urzędów(village in Lubelski region on a south-east part of Poland) and he i...")
- 08:49, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,024) . . N Claudio Fazzone (Created page with "Claudio Fazzone (October 7, 1961) is an Italian politician and entrepreneur. == Political career == Claudio Fazzone has first been elected in Senate in 2006 with Forza Italia...")
- 08:49, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:ΑÏχείο λήψης (6).jpg (current)
- 08:48, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . Bruno Dias
- 08:48, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+7) . . Mikko Alatalo
- 08:48, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,522) . . N Leos Heger (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left Leos Heger was born on February 11, 1948 in Hradec Kralove. He is a Czech physician, university teacher and politician of the TOP ...")
- 08:48, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2,005) . . N Alexandra Papariga (Created page with "Alexandra Papariga was born in Athens in 1945. She is a Greek politician and teacher. Elected MP with KKE in elections of 1993, 1996, 2000, 2004, 2007 and 2009. == Political ...")
- 08:48, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . Carlos Santos Silva
- 08:48, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+687) . . N Antonio Placido (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|Antonio Placido == Biography == Antonio Placido was born in March 29th 1962 in Potenza, Basilicata. He is an italian polit...")
- 08:48, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Katharina Dröge (current)
- 08:48, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+860) . . N Jacques Monasch (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left Jacques Monasch was born on the 4th of January 1962 in Rotterdam. He is a member of the Dutch House of Representatives for the Labour...")
- 08:47, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Katharina Droege 431.jpg (current)
- 08:46, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Katharina Dröge
- 08:46, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Katharina Dröge
- 08:46, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+62) . . Katharina Dröge
- 08:45, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+50) . . Zoltán Daniš
- 08:45, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:K.dröge.jpeg (current)
- 08:45, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Bruno Coimbra
- 08:45, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Zoltán Daniš.jpeg (current)
- 08:44, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+869) . . N Katharina Dröge (Created page with "Katharina Dröge is a German politician and member of the Alliance 90 / The Greens. == Political Career == Dröge was the state chairman of the Young Greens of North Rhine-We...")
- 08:43, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . Carlos Santos Silva
- 08:42, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . Carlos Santos Silva
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)