User contributions
This user is currently blocked. The latest block log entry is provided below for reference:
- 10:31, 21 October 2014 Anjuoh (talk | contribs) blocked Robertson (talk | contribs) with an expiration time of indefinite (account creation disabled, autoblock disabled, email disabled)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 13:35, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,462) . . N Alexander Kops (Created page with "Alexander Kops (born on November 23th, 1984) is a member of the Dutch Senate for the Party for Freedom (PVV). In the Dutch Senate he focuses on foreign policy, Europe and envi...")
- 13:35, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+80) . . Jozef Valocký
- 13:34, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+560) . . N Artemios Matthaiopoulos (Created page with "Artemios Matthaiopoulos was born in Thessaloniki in 1984.He is a Greek politician and music teacher. ==Political Career == He elected MP for Laikos Syndesmos - Chrysi Avgi (...")
- 13:34, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+9) . . Henk Nijboer
- 13:33, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+27) . . Ivan Uhliarik
- 13:33, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,509) . . N Andrzej Gut-Mosotwy (Created page with "Andrzej Gut-Mostowy was born 30 October 1960 in Zakopane. He is member of Polish Parlament since 2005. == Political career == Gut-Mostowy began his career in 1995 as a Coun...")
- 13:33, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Helma Népperus
- 13:32, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+35) . . Viera Tomanová
- 13:31, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+787) . . N Conceição Bessa Ruão (Created page with "Maria da Conceição Alves dos Santos Bessa Ruão Pinto was born on August 28th, 1954. She currently practices as a lawyer and a manager. == Political Career == This is Conce...")
- 13:31, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+13) . . Agnes Mulder
- 13:31, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+648) . . N Alfonso Bonafede (Created page with "Alfonso Bonafede (born in Mazara del Vallo on July 2nd 1976) is an Italian politician. He is a member of the Movimento Cinque Stelle political party. == Political Career == ...")
- 13:30, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+27) . . Ivan Å vejna
- 13:29, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Anne Mulder
- 13:29, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+71) . . Mario Galea
- 13:29, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,228) . . N Thomas Peter Burgos Beteta (Created page with "Thomas Peter Burgos Beteta (29 June, 1959) He was Born in Villanueva del Arzobispo (Jaén). He is member of the Spanish Senate within the People's Party (PP). == Education ==...")
- 13:29, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+263) . . Mario Galea
- 13:28, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Alain Claeys
- 13:28, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+999) . . N Andrew Adonis, Lord Adonis (Created page with " He was born in London in 1963. He is a reformer, a writer and a Labour peer. == Political career == He was a journalist at the Financial Times for five years from 1991 to...")
- 13:27, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,333) . . N Alain Claeys (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|Alain Claeys, Member of the French National Assembly Alain Claeys (born August 25, 1948) is a Socialist Party member of the National Ass...")
- 13:25, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+7) . . Perjan Moors (current)
- 13:25, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+844) . . N Josip BenÄić (Created page with "Josip Benčić was born on 28 June 1961 in Karlovac. He is a member of the Social Democratic Party of Croatia (SDP; Croatian: Socijaldemokratska partija Hrvatske) and was a me...")
- 13:25, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-3) . . Denis O'Donovan
- 13:24, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Deborah Schembri
- 13:24, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+613) . . N Maria João Ãvila (Created page with "Maria João Machado de Ávila was born on July 26th, 1956. She currently practices as deputy at the Portuguese National Assembly. She is also a Business woman as public relati...")
- 13:23, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . Jacques Monasch
- 13:23, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,555) . . N Katherine Zappone (Created page with "Katherine Zappone (November 25, 1953) is a public policy research consultant and member of the Human Rights Commission in Ireland. == Education == Katherine Zappone has got a...")
- 13:23, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-10) . . Heike Baehrens
- 13:23, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Deborah Schembri.jpg (current)
- 13:22, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+817) . . N Heike Baehrens (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|Heike Baehrens Heike Baehrens (born 21. September 1955) is a German politician and a member of the Social Democratic Pa...")
- 13:22, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,048) . . N Hildegarde Naughton (Created page with "Hildegarde Naughton was born 1977. She is a Fine Gael Senator and a primary school teacher. == Political Career == Ms Naughton was a member of Galway City Council since 2...")
- 13:22, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Baehrens heike gross.jpg (current)
- 13:22, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+894) . . N Anne Barzin (Created page with "Anne Barzin, born in Namur on August 18, 1975, is a Belgian politician and MP of the French Community. == Political Career == Barzin is Member of the French Parliament sin...")
- 13:22, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-49) . . Antonin Seda (current)
- 13:20, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2,786) . . N Apostolos Alexopoulos (Created page with "Apostolos Alexopoulos [Greek: Απόστολος Αλεξόπουλος, born on 23 April 1952 in Tropaia, Arcadia (Greece)] is a greek politician, Associate Professor at the ...")
- 13:20, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+26) . . Zsolt Simon
- 13:19, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . Petar Baranović
- 13:19, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-4) . . Ciara Conway (current)
- 13:19, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,024) . . N Boriana Ã…berg (Created page with " Boriana Åberg was born on the 1968 in Bulgaria. She is a member of the Swedish Parliament and is representing the Moderate Party since 2010. == Political Career == Boriana...")
- 13:18, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+26) . . Ján Senko
- 13:18, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Barbara Pollastrini.jpg (current)
- 13:16, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Mária Ritomská
- 13:16, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+773) . . N Nevenka BeÄić (Created page with "Nevenka Bečić was born on 5 March 1958 in Split, Croatia. She is a member of the Croatian Civic Party (Croatian: Hrvatska građanska stranka or HGS) and has been a member of...")
- 13:16, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Alastair John Lyndhurst Bruce, Baron Aberdare
- 13:15, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+762) . . N Clara Marques Mendes (Created page with "Maria Clara Gonçalves Marques Mendes was born on April 30th, 1970. She currently practices as a lawyer. == Political Career == Maria Marques Mendes is a Member of the Munici...")
- 13:15, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+13) . . Vicente Ferrer Roselló (current)
- 13:15, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,004) . . N Alastair John Lyndhurst Bruce, Baron Aberdare (Created page with " Alastair John Lyndhurst Bruce Baron Aberdare was born on 2 May 1947. He is a non-partisan elected hereditary peer since 2009. == Political career = In July 2009 he was ele...")
- 13:15, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+729) . . N Michiel van Nispen (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left Michiel van Nispen was born on the 14th of October 1982 in Breda. He is a member of the Dutch House of Representatives for the Soc...")
- 13:15, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+57) . . N Algimantas Salamakinas (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|Salamakinas")
- 13:14, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Amparo Ferrando Sendra (current)
- 13:14, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Salamakinas.jpg (current)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)