User contributions
This user is currently blocked. The latest block log entry is provided below for reference:
- 10:31, 21 October 2014 Anjuoh (talk | contribs) blocked Robertson (talk | contribs) with an expiration time of indefinite (account creation disabled, autoblock disabled, email disabled)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 13:53, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-4) . . Celeste Correia
- 13:52, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,711) . . N Barbara Pollastrini (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|Barbara Pollastrini == Biography == Barbara Pollastrini was born on September 30th 1947 in Darfo Boario Terme, Provin...")
- 13:52, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+3) . . CecÃlia Meireles
- 13:51, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+974) . . N Alain Fauré (Created page with "Alain Fauré (born October 1, 1962) is a member of the French National Assembly for the second constituency of Ariége, on the southern French border with Spain and Andorra. F...")
- 13:51, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-4) . . Averil Power
- 13:50, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-4) . . CecÃlia Honório
- 13:50, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+335) . . Averil Power
- 13:50, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+799) . . N Imelda Henry (Created page with "Imelda Henry was born March 5th 1967. She is an Irish senator, member of the Fine Gael party. == Political Career == Imelda Henry was part of the Sligo County Council fro...")
- 13:50, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+732) . . N Maria José Castelo Branco (Created page with "Maria José Quintela Ferreira Castelo Branco was born on July 28th, 1958. She currently serves as Deputy for the Portuguese National Assembly. She practices as as geologist an...")
- 13:49, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . Lord Allen of Kensington
- 13:49, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . Catarina Martins
- 13:49, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . Michael Allenby, Viscount of Megiddo
- 13:48, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Catarina Marcelino
- 13:48, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-57) . . Waheed Alli, Baron Alli
- 13:48, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+930) . . N Marc Mac Sharry (Created page with "Marc Mac Sharry (July 12, 1973) is an Irish politician and former estate agent. == Education == He went at St. John’s Marist brothers Sligo school, the Castleknock College ...")
- 13:47, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Carlos São Martinho
- 13:47, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+22) . . Magdaléna Vášáryová
- 13:47, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2,349) . . N Waheed Alli, Baron Alli (Created page with "Waheed Alli, Baron Alli (born 16 November 1964) is a British multimillionaire media entrepreneur and politician. == Political Career == Alli joined the Labour Party at the p...")
- 13:46, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Carlos Santos Silva
- 13:45, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+28) . . Jana Vaľová
- 13:45, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,367) . . N Boris Blažeković (Created page with "Boris Blažeković was born on 24 February 1955 in Zagreb. He has been a member of the Croatian People's Party - Liberal Democrats (Croatian: Hrvatska Narodna Stranka) since 1...")
- 13:45, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Alexander Kops
- 13:44, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,428) . . N Correia de Jesus (Created page with "Manuel Filipe Correia de Jesus was born on December 16th, 1941. He currently practices as a lawyer and an university teacher. == Political Career == Besides being the preside...")
- 13:44, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+462) . . Algimantas Salamakinas
- 13:44, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Michael Gonzi
- 13:44, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Alfredo D'Attorre
- 13:44, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+99) . . Michael Allenby, Viscount of Megiddo
- 13:43, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+730) . . N Alfredo D'Attorre (Created page with "Alfredo D'Attorre (born in Melfi on August 30th 1973) is an Italian politician. He is a member of the Democratic Party. == Political Career == Since 2012 he has been commiss...")
- 13:43, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+30) . . Tuur Elzinga
- 13:43, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+332) . . Michael Gonzi
- 13:43, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,501) . . N Haleh Afshar, Baroness Afshar (Created page with " She was born on 21 May 1944 in Iran. She is a British professor and a life peer in the House of Lords. == Political career == Haleh Afshar is a professor in politics and w...")
- 13:42, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+139) . . Deborah Schembri
- 13:42, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Jaroslav Klaška.jpg (current)
- 13:41, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+960) . . N Toni Dragar (Created page with "Toni Dragar (born May 7, 1961) is a member of the National Council of the Republic of Slovenia. == Political career == Dragar was active as a municipal councilor and in ...") (current)
- 13:41, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+714) . . N Branko Vukšić (Biography Branko Vuksic)
- 13:41, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . Ankie Broekers-Knol
- 13:40, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Michael Allenby, Viscount of Megiddo (Robertson moved page Viscount Allenby of Megiddo to Michael Allenby, Viscount of Megiddo)
- 13:40, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+50) . . N Viscount Allenby of Megiddo (Robertson moved page Viscount Allenby of Megiddo to Michael Allenby, Viscount of Megiddo) (current)
- 13:40, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,554) . . N Apostolos Vesyropoulos (Created page with "Apostolos Vesiropoulos (Greek: Απόστολος Βεσυρόπουλος, born in Veroia in 1966) is a greek politician and Civil Cervant. == Political Career == From 1...")
- 13:40, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,047) . . N Michael Allenby, Viscount of Megiddo (Created page with "Lieutenant-Colonel Michael Jaffray Hynman Allenby, 3rd Viscount Allenby (born 20 April 1931) is a British politician and hereditary peer. He is the great-nephew of Edmund Alle...")
- 13:40, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . Diarmuid Wilson
- 13:38, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Michiel van Nispen
- 13:37, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-10) . . Agnes Mulder
- 13:37, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Andrzej Jaworski.jpg (current)
- 13:36, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+3) . . Eamonn Coghlan
- 13:36, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,170) . . N Daniela Filipiova (Created page with "Daniela Filipiová was born on August 9, 1957, in Prague. She is a Czech politician and architect. She currently holds the office of Senator of the Senate. From January to May...")
- 13:36, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+87) . . Artemios Matthaiopoulos
- 13:36, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+906) . . N Avelino de Barrionuevo Gener (Created page with "Avelino de Barrionuevo Gener is a Spanish politician, member of the People's Party (PP). He was born in Malaga on October 8th, 1969. == Political Career == Avelino de Barrio...")
- 13:35, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+146) . . Algimantas Salamakinas
- 13:35, 6 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:ΑÏχείο λήψης (14).jpg (current)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)