User contributions
This user is currently blocked. The latest block log entry is provided below for reference:
- 10:31, 21 October 2014 Anjuoh (talk | contribs) blocked Robertson (talk | contribs) with an expiration time of indefinite (account creation disabled, autoblock disabled, email disabled)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 10:02, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Ntavlouros.jpg (current)
- 10:01, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Asdin El Habbassi (Robertson moved page El Habbassi, Asdin to Asdin El Habbassi)
- 10:01, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+31) . . N El Habbassi, Asdin (Robertson moved page El Habbassi, Asdin to Asdin El Habbassi) (current)
- 10:01, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+622) . . N Carina Oliveira (Created page with "Carina João Reis Oliveira was born on July 22nd, 1977. She currently practices as a civil engineer. == Political Career == This is Carina Oliveira’s second mandate as a de...")
- 10:01, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-16) . . Alexander Miesen
- 10:01, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+566) . . N Athanasios Ntavlouros (Created page with "Athanasios Ntavlouros was born in Patra in 1958.He is a Greek politician and former police officer. == Political Career == Former Brigadier General and Commander of Security...")
- 10:00, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Losacco.jpg (current)
- 10:00, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+123) . . Algis Kaseta
- 09:59, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+53) . . Ramon Alturo Lloan
- 09:59, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+31) . . Alain Destexhe
- 09:58, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+84) . . Algis Kaseta
- 09:58, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Joachim Brudziński
- 09:58, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+561) . . N Anders Ahlgren (Created page with " Anders Ahlgren was born on the 23rd of October 1952 in Sweden. He is a member of the swedish parliament representing the Centre Party. == Political Career == Anders Ahlberg...")
- 09:57, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+49) . . N Algis Kaseta (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left")
- 09:57, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:1229062205kas81.jpg (current)
- 09:55, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:JW.jpg (current)
- 09:54, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+42) . . Vicente Alberto Ãlvarez Areces,
- 09:54, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+50) . . Martin Fedor
- 09:53, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-15) . . Jose Manuel Barreiro Fernandez
- 09:53, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Martin fedor pr.jpg (current)
- 09:52, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,726) . . N Martin Fedor (Created page with "Martin Fedor is a member of the National council of Slovak Republic. He was born on 4th of March in 1974. He stood for a seat of SDKÚ-DS in Trenčianske Teplice. He is former...")
- 09:52, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+8) . . Jose Manuel Barreiro Fernandez
- 09:51, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-61) . . Killion Munyama
- 09:51, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Algirdas Vaclovas Patackas
- 09:50, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2,308) . . N John Crown (Created page with "200px|thumbnail|left John Crown wast born March 1st 1957. A consultant oncologist by profession, he has served in the Irish Seanad since 2011. == Political ...")
- 09:50, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+220) . . Algirdas Vaclovas Patackas
- 09:49, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-4) . . Avelino de Barrionuevo Gener
- 09:49, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,693) . . N Adri Duivesteijn (Created page with "Adri Duivesteijn (born on August 27th, 1950) is a member of the Dutch Senate for the Labour Party (Pvda). == Political Career == Since February 5th, 2013 Adri Duivesteijn ha...")
- 09:49, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Elvira Savino.jpg (current)
- 09:48, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Sabien Lahaye Battheu
- 09:48, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+75) . . Algirdas Vaclovas Patackas
- 09:47, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-13) . . Jose Maria Becana Sanahuja
- 09:47, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-121) . . Jose Maria Becana Sanahuja
- 09:47, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Lorraine Higgins
- 09:47, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Egbert Lachaert
- 09:46, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+637) . . N Joel Barnett, Baron Barnett, (Created page with " Joel Barnett, Baron Barnett was born on 14 October 1923. He is a Labour Party member of the House of Lords. == Political career == He was elected Member of Parliament for ...")
- 09:46, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Ahmed Laaouej
- 09:46, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . Thomas Peter Burgos Beteta (current)
- 09:45, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,197) . . N DuÅ¡an Strnad (Created page with "Dušan Strnad (born October 24, 1961) is a member of the National Council of the Republic of Slovenia. == Political career == Strnad worked as General Secretary of the Sl...")
- 09:45, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Emir Kir
- 09:45, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-36) . . Elisa Simoni
- 09:45, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2,593) . . N Darko Milinović (Created page with "thumbnail|left|Darko Milinović Darko Milinović was born on 25 April 1963 in Gospić. He is a member of the Croatian Democratic Union (HDZ; Cr...")
- 09:44, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+545) . . N Ann-Christine Ahlberg (Created page with " Ann-Christine Ahlberg was born on the 27th of September 1957 in Sweden. She is an member of the Swedish Parliament representing the Social Democrats. == Political Career ==...")
- 09:44, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,131) . . N Elisa Simoni (Created page with "400px|thumbnail|left|Elisa Simoni == Biography == Elisa Simoni was born on July 26th 1973 in Figline Valdarno, near Florence, Toscana. She is an ...")
- 09:43, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . Marin Anton
- 09:42, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+728) . . N Dragica Zgrebec (Dragica Zgrebec)
- 09:42, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+627) . . N Bruno Vitorino (Created page with "== Political Career == Bruno Vitorino is a member of the Municipal Assembly of Barreiro. This is his fourth mandate as a deputy at the National Parliament for the PSD politica...")
- 09:41, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+821) . . N Angelo Senaldi (Created page with "Angelo Senaldi (July 2, 1962) is an Italian politician and trade manager for plastic materies company. == Education == He obtained a university degree in Chemistry. == Poli...")
- 09:41, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+65) . . Algirdas Vaclovas Patackas
- 09:41, 7 October 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-43) . . Darko Ledinski
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)